This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:45:53 (UTC).

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION VS. CARSON SUCCESSOR AGENCY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARSON SUCCESSOR AGENCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8350

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

SHAWNAN

Defendants

CITY OF CARSON

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

CARSON SUCCESSOR AGENCY

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRING KYLE D.

Defendant Attorney

ALESHIRE & WYNDER LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B) WITH THECOURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTIONPURSUANT TO CCP 664.6;) - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TOCRC, RULE 3.1385(B) WITH THECOURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTIONPURSUANT TO CCP 664.6;*DISMISSAL FILED 03/16/17*) - Advanced to this date & Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SHALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; (Order to Show Cause; Advanced to this date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (OF NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CARSON SUCCESSOR AGENCY (Defendant); CITY OF CARSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CARSON SUCCESSOR AGENCY (Defendant); CITY OF CARSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SHAWNAN (Legacy Party); SHALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SHALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less