This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 09:05:33 (UTC).

SHUNTA JACKSON VS. ANTHONY J. FRADELICH

Case Summary

On 03/07/2013 SHUNTA JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY J FRADELICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, DAVID SOTELO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8807

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DAVID SOTELO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON SHUNTA

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

FRADELICH ANTHONY JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WINTERS JONATHAN D.

HOM BILL

Defendant Attorneys

STUB BOEDDINGHAUS & VELASCO

PHILLIPS FIRM THE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORD1R FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/10/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORD1R FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 631

4/18/2013: DEMAND FOR JURY AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. ? 631

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/14/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

1/7/2014: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/15/2014: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE TO BE READ TO THE JURY

8/21/2014: DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE TO BE READ TO THE JURY

DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED EXIUBIT LIST

8/21/2014: DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED EXIUBIT LIST

DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED WITNESS LIST

8/21/2014: DEFENDANT ANTHONY FRADELICH?S PROPOSED WITNESS LIST

Minute Order

8/26/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/26/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/27/2015: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/27/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL; EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL

5/26/2015: PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL; EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL

Minute Order

5/26/2015: Minute Order

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S IX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL

5/26/2015: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S IX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE

5/26/2015: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/10/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2016
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Opposition (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Order (ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO OSC RE DISMISSAL; EX PARTE APPLICATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF TO SUBSTITUTE JONATHAN D. WINTERS AS HER COUNSEL IN PLACE OF HER FORMER COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Substitution of Attorney (incomplete form and Bill Hom still Atty on this case (for plaintiff) ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Statement Of The Case ((PROPOSED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • List of Witnesses ((PROPOSED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • List of Exhibits ((PROPOSED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Jury Instructions ((PROPOSED) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE JURY FEES $150.00 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLNTF TO GIVE NTC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Proof of Service ( SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PARTY SERVED: ANTHONY JOSEPH FRADELICH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less