This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 16:14:18 (UTC).

SHULAMITH S JANFAZA ET AL VS ASHLEY GRIMES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2016 SHULAMITH S JANFAZA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ASHLEY GRIMES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4541

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JANFAZA JAHANGIR S.

JANFAZA SHULAMITH S.

Defendants and Respondents

GRIMES ASHLEY

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

DOES 1 TO 50

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID SHAKER

SHAKER DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

TOROSIAN VAHAN

CHARBONEAU ROBERT B.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/6/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICER OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/6/2018: NOTICER OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

6/6/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF RULING

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

11/28/2018: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike

Minute Order

1/9/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/22/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

1/22/2019: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

2/4/2019: Notice of Ruling

Answer

2/19/2019: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/30/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/21/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/21/2016: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Ashley Grimes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Answer (to Complaint); Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 08:38 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Submitted Matter from 1/9/19)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Submitted Matter from 1/9/19) of 01/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to the Complaint of Plaintiffs) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to the Complai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Defendant's Notice of Motion; Demurrer and Motion for Demurrer to the Complaint of Shulamith S. Janfaza and Jahangir S. Janfaza; M of P's and Authorities; Declaration Requesting that the Court take Judicial Notice that Def. Rents Motor Vehicles; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Shulamith S. Janfaza (Plaintiff); Jahangir S. Janfaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC624541    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SHULAMITH S. JANFAZA, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ASHLEY GRIMES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC624541

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 12, 2019

Defendant’s motions to deem RFAs admitted are denied due to insufficient service. Defendant served the motions by mail on 10/15/19, setting them for hearing on 11/12/19. Pursuant to CCP §1005(b), moving papers must be filed at least sixteen court days prior to hearing; because the papers were served by mail, that time is extended by five calendar days. Pursuant to CCP §12c, the time for performance is determined by counting backwards from the hearing date (plus any additional days required because of mailing or other method of service), excluding the day of the hearing.

In this case, the hearing date is 11/12/19. 11/12/19 is excluded, and one begins counting backward sixteen days. Sixteen days falls on 10/18/19. One must then count an additional five calendar days, which lands on 10/13/19; because 10/13/19 was a Sunday, the last day for filing was Friday, 10/11/19. See also Stasz v. Eisenberg (2010) 190 Cal.App.4th 1032, 1038.

Notably, if one were to count FORWARD from the date of service, 10/15/19, then 11/12/19 would be an appropriate date for the hearing on the motion. The Court, however, is not aware of any authority permitting the moving party to do so. Plaintiffs appropriate objected to the motions on this ground, and the Court finds the motions must be denied.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.