Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 15:41:48 (UTC).

SHULA ROTH-BARASH VS JEORGE ZIONI ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2016 SHULA ROTH-BARASH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEORGE ZIONI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0524

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LAW OFFICES OF SHULA ROTH-BARASH THE

ROTH-BARASH SHULA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

BHNN CORPORATION

LAVA HEAT ITALIA

ZIONI JEORGE

ITALIA LAVA HEAT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HELLER & EDWARDS

FRIEDMAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

12/21/2017: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

Unknown

2/21/2019: Unknown

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

2/22/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Writ of Execution

2/22/2019: Writ of Execution

Motion for Order

3/8/2019: Motion for Order

Notice

5/13/2019: Notice

COMPLAINT FOR I. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

8/12/2016: COMPLAINT FOR I. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

8/15/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/22/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/31/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/6/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Unknown

10/27/2016: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/17/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT

12/21/2016: JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF SHULA ROTH-BARASH IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AFTER ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/21/2016: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF SHULA ROTH-BARASH IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AFTER ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

12/21/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/24/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

5/26/2017: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff); Law Offices of Shula Roth-Barash, The (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF / RESCHEDULED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JEORGE ZIONI AKA GEORGE ZIONI); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff); Law Offices of Shula Roth-Barash, The (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Charging and Assignment Orders) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Charging and Assignment ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Order ((Proposed) Assignment Order); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Order ((Proposed) Charging Order); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Motion for Order (Notice of Motion and Motion for Charging and Assignment Orders; declaration of David Friedman and Memorandum of Points and Authorities); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff); Law Offices of Shula Roth-Barash, The (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR I. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Shula Roth-Barash (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC630524    Hearing Date: June 30, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: June 30, 2020

Case Name: Roth-Barash v. Zioni, et al.

Case No.: BC630524

Motion: Motion to Foreclose and Sell Defendant’s Interest in LLCs

Moving Party: Plaintiff Shula Roth-Barash

Responding Party: Unopposed

Tentative Ruling: The Motion is granted.

On December 21, 2016, the Court entered a default judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. (Friedman Decl., Exhibit A.) Plaintiff thereafter obtained a charging and assignment order as to Defendant Jeorge Zioni’s interest in 777 YMB Properties, LLC, Hamazon G2, LLC, and Mont De Pellier, LLC. (Id., Exhibit C.) Subsequently, the Court appointed a receiver to take possession of Zioni’s distributions and to liquidate Zioni’s interests in the aforementioned LLCs. (Id., Exhibit H.)

Plaintiff now seeks to foreclose upon and sell Zioni’s interests in 777 YMB Properties, LLC, Hamazon G2, LLC, and Mont De Pellier, LLC. Plaintiff requests such relief because, due to various difficulties, a receiver could not enforce the aforementioned charging/assignment order.

As the Motion is unopposed, it is granted. (Corp. Code §§ 17302(b), 17705.03(b)(3); Sexton v. Superior Court (1997) 58 Cal.App.4th 1403, 1410.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BHNN CORPORATION is a litigant