This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 08:53:02 (UTC).

SHIQUING BI VS PHILIP QUEZADA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 SHIQUING BI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PHILIP QUEZADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, ROLF M. TREU and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7290

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

ROLF M. TREU

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BI SHIQUING

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

QUEZADA LORENA

QUEZADA PHILIP

Cross Defendant

BARBA DELICIA WONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARK J. WARFEL

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ARMENTA MICHAEL ESQUIRE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION 1. TRESPASS,; ETC

7/8/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION 1. TRESPASS,; ETC

SUMMONS

7/8/2015: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT PFHLEP QUEZADA'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

10/23/2015: DEFENDANT PFHLEP QUEZADA'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/11/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS SHIQING BI AND WENLING WU FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PLEAD; ETC.

3/2/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS SHIQING BI AND WENLING WU FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PLEAD; ETC.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS SHIQING BI AND WENLING WU?S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PHILIP QUEZADA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; (PR

3/9/2016: CROSS-DEFENDANTS SHIQING BI AND WENLING WU?S NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PHILIP QUEZADA; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; (PR

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/28/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Unknown

4/6/2016: Unknown

CROSS-COMPLAINANT PHILIP QUEZADA'S OPPOSITION AND PARTIAL NON-OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT REIMAX DYNASTY, INC TO THE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/13/2016: CROSS-COMPLAINANT PHILIP QUEZADA'S OPPOSITION AND PARTIAL NON-OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT REIMAX DYNASTY, INC TO THE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/18/2016: REPLY TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE 2. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

6/13/2016: VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. QUIET TITLE 2. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

Minute Order

7/19/2016: Minute Order

TENTATIVE RULING: DEMURRER TO THE SACC IS MOOT AND IS OVERRULED. REMAX TO ANSWER WITHIN 15 DAYS

9/2/2016: TENTATIVE RULING: DEMURRER TO THE SACC IS MOOT AND IS OVERRULED. REMAX TO ANSWER WITHIN 15 DAYS

Minute Order

12/1/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/5/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT; ETC.

4/11/2017: DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT; ETC.

VERIFIED THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: QUIET TITLE; ETC.

6/8/2017: VERIFIED THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: QUIET TITLE; ETC.

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/9/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 26; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 26; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PERMANENT INJUNCTION ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Shiquing Bi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION 1. TRESPASS,; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC587290    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: November 14, 2019

Case Name: Bi, et al. v. Quezada, et al.

Case No.: BC587290

Motion: Motion to Enforce Settlement

Moving Party: Plaintiffs Shiqing Bi and Wendling Wu

Responding Party: Defendant Philip Quezada

Tentative Ruling: The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing.

Plaintiffs seek to enforce the settlement in this action. Plaintiffs principally argue that Defendant has failed to execute an easement for ingress and egress as required by the parties’ stipulation for settlement.

Defendant concedes that the Court has retained jurisdiction to enforce the subject settlement (Code Civ. Proc. § 664.6.) However, Defendant challenges the scope of the easement provided by Plaintiffs. Specifically, Defendant argues, “[n]o where in the Stipulation did Quezada agree to provide Plaintiffs with an easement to the area adjacent to the stairs or right above the beginning of the driveway as noted on Plaintiffs's Sketch of Easement (Exhibit D to the Easement Deed) presented to Quezada for signature. Plaintiffs' counsel's explanation in his February 25, 2019 letter that it appeared the surveyor mapped the area that he believed was obviously necessary to use the property as currently situated and that he had no part in the survey is not sufficient to support Plaintiffs' argument that Quezada should sign the easement as presented.” (Opposition at p. 6.) That is, Defendant seems to argue that the easement provided by Plaintiffs is not strictly for ingress and egress.

The parties have not provided sufficient information for the Court to determine the propriety of the subject easement. The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on this issue and thereafter provide a ruling. The date for such hearing will be discussed at the Motion hearing.