This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 07:38:58 (UTC).

SHERRIE PAYTON VS BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO

Case Summary

On 04/01/2014 SHERRIE PAYTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1201

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAYTON SHERRIE

Defendants and Respondents

BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Cross Defendants

FP CONTRACTING INC. (DOE 1)

ROES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

FP CONTRACTING INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDSZER RONALD I. ESQ.

RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN A PROF. LAW CORP.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.

HAHN ADRIENNE R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/16/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

FP CONTRACTING, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO.

9/19/2014: FP CONTRACTING, INC.'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FP CONTRACTING, INC. FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 2. EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

9/19/2014: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF FP CONTRACTING, INC. FOR: 1. EQUITABLE INDEMNITY; 2. EQUITABLE CONTRIBUTION; AND 3. DECLARATORY RELIEF

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/17/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

11/7/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

3/17/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

EX PARTE

6/17/2015: EX PARTE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

9/8/2015: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

LIEN FOR PROFESSIONAL SERVICES BY FORMER COUNSEL RENDERED TO PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT

11/6/2015: LIEN FOR PROFESSIONAL SERVICES BY FORMER COUNSEL RENDERED TO PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

11/6/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

DECLARATION OF ARASH NEMATOLLAHI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FP CONTRACTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/26/2016: DECLARATION OF ARASH NEMATOLLAHI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FP CONTRACTING'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/26/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CARL KREME

2/4/2016: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CARL KREME

NOTICE OF RULING

2/8/2016: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/1/2016: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order -

5/5/2016: Minute Order -

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

5/16/2016: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/19/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sherrie Payton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 98; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by FP CONTRACTING, INC. (DOE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Baldwin Hills Associates Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by 1st Class Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by FP CONTRACTING, INC. (DOE 1) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 98; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Baldwin Hills Associates Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Baldwin Hills Associates Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINTPERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketANSWER OF BALI) WIN IHLLS ASSOCIATES CO. TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sherrie Payton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sherrie Payton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES NEGLIGENCE PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FP CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BALDWIN HILLS ASSOCIATES CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAHN ADRIENNE R