This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 02:05:31 (UTC).

SHERRIE KRAMER ET AL VS TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2011 SHERRIE KRAMER filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5354

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRAMER PHILIP

KRAMER SHERRIE

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

TWAROWSKI EUGENE H. III

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARGOLESE VANA PARKER ESQ.

HUNKINS WAYNE

Defendant Attorneys

CHILD & MORTON LLP

MORONEY E. THOMAS ESQ.

CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.

LODMER ZACHARY H.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

3/26/2013: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME ON PENDING DISCOVERY

4/29/2013: DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS/CROSS-DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CONTINUE DISCOVERY AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME ON PENDING DISCOVERY

Minute Order -

4/29/2013: Minute Order -

MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CONTINUE

5/10/2013: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CONTINUE

NOTICER OF RULING

9/25/2013: NOTICER OF RULING

Minute Order -

11/21/2013: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF BRADFORD T. CHILD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

12/2/2013: DECLARATION OF BRADFORD T. CHILD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA

AGREEMENT TO EXCLUDE OIAL AND/OR WRITTEN TESTIMONY FROM DR PNEILIP KRAMER AT TRIAL

1/7/2014: AGREEMENT TO EXCLUDE OIAL AND/OR WRITTEN TESTIMONY FROM DR PNEILIP KRAMER AT TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

1/17/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Minute Order -

2/14/2014: Minute Order -

STIPULATION FOR COURT TO HEAR AND DECIDE LEGAL ISSUES

5/16/2014: STIPULATION FOR COURT TO HEAR AND DECIDE LEGAL ISSUES

NOTICE OF RULING

7/8/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order -

9/23/2014: Minute Order -

SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF EUGENE TWAROWSKI AND E. THOMAS MORONEY RE DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULTS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

6/12/2015: SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF EUGENE TWAROWSKI AND E. THOMAS MORONEY RE DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULTS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULTS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/12/2015: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULTS AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ATTONEY FEES? AND COSTS

7/1/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR ATTONEY FEES? AND COSTS

Minute Order -

10/2/2015: Minute Order -

DECLARATION IN RE SERVICE OF CCP998 OFFER OF SETTLEMENT FROM PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANTS

10/13/2015: DECLARATION IN RE SERVICE OF CCP998 OFFER OF SETTLEMENT FROM PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANTS

160 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2027
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Hearing04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 49; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff); Philip Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
407 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sherrie Kramer (Plaintiff); Philip Kramer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LODMER ZACHARY HARRIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORONEY E. THOMAS LAW OFFICES OF