This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 18:23:13 (UTC).

SHERRI TURNER ET AL VS AMCORD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 SHERRI TURNER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8746

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOWE JOANNE

TURNER SHERRI

VIRGIL KENDALLE

WALKER ALBERT JR.

WALKER ALISA

Defendants and Respondents

AMCORD INC.

CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY COMPANY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT INC.

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LAW O/O

WFBM LLP ORANGE

AMEELE MELANIE LEIGH

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

11/5/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/5/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (BRAYTON PURCELL LLP GROUP STATUS CONFERENC...)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (BRAYTON PURCELL LLP GROUP STATUS CONFERENC...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATES

10/28/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING SETTING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

1/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF RESOLUTION

2/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESOLUTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

2/18/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (WALKER-BC498746))

2/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) (WALKER-BC498746))

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

5/7/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • Hearing03/03/2021 at 13:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Hearing03/03/2021 at 13:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((Brayton Purcell LLP)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Walker-BC498746)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (Brayton Purcell LLP); Order to Show Cause ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Status Conference ((Brayton Purcell LLP)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Walker-BC498746)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (Re: Clayton- BC636652); Trial Setti...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 15, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Walker-BC498746)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO SACRAMENTO STUCCO CO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL MERLEX STUCCO, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sherri Turner (Plaintiff); Alisa Walker (Plaintiff); Kendalle Virgil (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less