Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 21:29:01 (UTC).

SHERMAN NEUSOM VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 SHERMAN NEUSOM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE, DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3897

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIZABETH ALLEN WHITE

DEBRE KATZ WEINTRAUB

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

NEUSOM SHERMAN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

LLOYD JEFFREY

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

POLINA STANTON

HORIZON REALTY POLINA CHMYREVA

BOXENBAUM SCOTT

YONAY AMIT

DOES 1-100

CHMYREVA POLINA

HORIZON REALTY

STANTON POLINA

NEUSOM SHERMAN

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Plaintiff

BOXENBAUM SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARRY E. COHEN APC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

7/25/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/25/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/22/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

3/16/2018: Minute Order -

N01ICE OF RELATED CASE

8/6/2018: N01ICE OF RELATED CASE

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

12/22/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order -

5/1/2017: Minute Order -

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 17O.6

6/28/2017: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 17O.6

Minute Order -

7/6/2017: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/11/2017: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/31/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/10/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CROSS-DEFENDANT SHERMAN NEUSOM'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/21/2017: CROSS-DEFENDANT SHERMAN NEUSOM'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

10/12/2017: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

10/16/2017: Minute Order -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

10/17/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketN01ICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 1; (Order ReReassignment of Case; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant