Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2021 at 12:12:04 (UTC).

SHELLEY O ALBA ET AL VS FRANK REGUEIRO ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2016 SHELLEY O ALBA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRANK REGUEIRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and LEE W. TSAO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5258

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

LEE W. TSAO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ALBA ALEXIS P.

VALENCIA RICHARD J.

ALBA ALYSSA I.

ALBA ALEXIS P

VALENCIA RICHARD J

ALBA SHELLEY O

ALBA ALYSSA I

Defendants and Respondents

REGUEIRO FRANK

DOES 1 TO 100

REGUEIRO ELIZABETH

DOES 1-100

REGUEIRO ELIZABETH TRUSTEE TO REGUEIRO

Minors

ALBA ANTHONY D.

ALBA ANTHONY D

Guardian Ad Litems

ALBA SHELLEY O.

ALBA SHELLEY O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS ESQ.

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS

VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

BAURAC JOSEPHINE NEAL

ASH PAUL V. ESQ.

HANGER STEINBERG SHAPIRO & ASH

ASH PAUL VAUGHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

7/19/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF SHELLEY O. ALBAS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND COPYING OF OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH

7/9/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF SHELLEY O. ALBAS RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND COPYING OF OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JOSEPH

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR - SHELLEY ALBA

11/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR - SHELLEY ALBA

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR - ALEXIS ALBA

11/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR - ALEXIS ALBA

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

7/27/2020: Order - TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

4/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply to Motion

6/2/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Reply to Motion

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

9/12/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-16 00:00:00

8/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-08-16 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

8/16/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Order - Order to continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Status Conference, and Trial Date

11/30/2018: Order - Order to continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Final Status Conference, and Trial Date

Notice - Notice of and Defendants' Unopposed and Stipulated-to Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Court To Hear and Rule on Motion to Continue MSC and Trial Dates; Memorandum of Points and Autho

11/30/2018: Notice - Notice of and Defendants' Unopposed and Stipulated-to Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Court To Hear and Rule on Motion to Continue MSC and Trial Dates; Memorandum of Points and Autho

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue the Mandatory Settlement Conference); Filed by FRANK REGUEIRO (Defendant); ELIZABETH REGUEIRO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed (ISSUED 1/12/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued (FOR DAMAGES 12/29/16 CCH524880008/$435.00 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketPetition for Appointment; Filed by SHELLEY O ALBA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHELLEY O ALBA (Plaintiff); Richard J. Valencia (Plaintiff); Alexis P. Alba (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHELLEY O ALBA (Plaintiff); Richard J. Valencia (Plaintiff); Alexis P. Alba (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketPetition for Appointment (APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPT. OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1) NEGLIGENT BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC645258    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: SEC

ALBA, et al. v. REGUEIRO, et al.

CASE NO.: BC645258

HEARING: 11/12/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#5

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant Frank Regueiro’s motion for court order to compel Plaintiff Alexis Alba’s responses to demand for inspection and copying of documents, set one is GRANTED.

II. Defendant Frank Regueiro’s motion for court order to compel Plaintiff Shelley O. Alba’s responses to demand for inspection and copying of documents, set one is GRANTED.

III. Defendant Frank Regueiro’s motion for court order to compel Plaintiff Richard Valencia’s responses to demand for inspection and copying of documents, set one is GRANTED.

Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to discovery without objections within 20 days. No sanctions.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Defendant Frank Regueiro moves to compel responses demand for production of documents pursuant to CCP § 2031.300.

CCP § 2031.300(b) allow the propounding party to file a motion to compel responses to document demands if a response has not been received. If responses are untimely, responding party waives objections. (CCP § 2031.300(a).)

Plaintiffs Alexis Alba, Shelley Alba, and Richard Valencia failed to serve any responses. Accordingly, the motions are GRANTED. Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to discovery without objections within 20 days. No sanctions requested.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALENCIA EVERARDO VARGAS