This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:12:43 (UTC).

SHEILA WILLIAMS, ET. AL VS. CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET. AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2012 SHEILA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, WILLIAM BARRY and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6252

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

WILLIAM BARRY

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWELL NAYKEYA

WILLIAMS SHEILA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF

VEOLIA TRANSPORATION SERVCIES INC. A

NELSON CAROLYN RENEE HAWKINS (DOE 1)

DOBBINS GENEVA SMITH

VEOLIA TRANSPORATION SERVCIES

DOES 1 TO 25

DOBBINS ROBERT J.

DASH

HAWKINS CAROLYN

Guardian Ad Litem

SHEILA WILLIAMS

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Minor

DOUGLAS DENIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

GABRIEL & ASSOCIATES LAW OFFICES OF .

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT KELLY CROWLEY & JENNETT LLP

CLINTON & CLINTON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/6/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT BOBBINS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF 4 FOR ORDER ALLOWING OFFSET TO ANY JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES

6/17/2014: DEFENDANT BOBBINS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF 4 FOR ORDER ALLOWING OFFSET TO ANY JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CO-DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Minute Order

5/12/2014: Minute Order

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1: DEFENDANTS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, VEOLIA TRANSPORTATION, INC. AND CAROLYN HAWKINS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE GOLDEN RULE A

10/4/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.1: DEFENDANTS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, VEOLIA TRANSPORTATION, INC. AND CAROLYN HAWKINS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE GOLDEN RULE A

PLAINTIFFS? EXHIBIT LIST

11/5/2013: PLAINTIFFS? EXHIBIT LIST

ORDER

4/8/2014: ORDER

PROPOSEDI PLAINTIFFS? JURY ) INSTRUCTIONS )

11/5/2013: PROPOSEDI PLAINTIFFS? JURY ) INSTRUCTIONS )

Minute Order

5/2/2014: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER OF MAY 2, 2014, RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL

5/8/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER OF MAY 2, 2014, RE OSC RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order

7/16/2014: Minute Order

ORDER] AND STIPDLATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

6/17/2014: ORDER] AND STIPDLATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

PLAINTIFFS? LIST OF TRIAL WITNESSES

11/5/2013: PLAINTIFFS? LIST OF TRIAL WITNESSES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/6/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF RULING

11/5/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.: 4 DEFENDANTS, VEOLIA TRANSPORATION SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TRIAL TESTIMONY TO THAT TESTIMONY THAT WAS OFFERED AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF MARLON D?OYEN IN SUPPO

10/4/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.: 4 DEFENDANTS, VEOLIA TRANSPORATION SERVICES, INC.?S MOTION TO LIMIT EXPERT TRIAL TESTIMONY TO THAT TESTIMONY THAT WAS OFFERED AT DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF MARLON D?OYEN IN SUPPO

Minute Order

4/10/2014: Minute Order

DEFENDANT GENEVA SMITH DOBBINS? AND ROBERT J. DOBBINS? OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF DENIM DOUGLAS, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SHEILA WILLIAMS, OFFER TO COMPROMISE IC.C.P. 9981

4/8/2014: DEFENDANT GENEVA SMITH DOBBINS? AND ROBERT J. DOBBINS? OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF DENIM DOUGLAS, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SHEILA WILLIAMS, OFFER TO COMPROMISE IC.C.P. 9981

MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2: DEFENDANTS; DEFENDANTS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, VEOLIA TRANSPORTATION, INC. AND CAROLYN HAWKINS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE IMPRO

10/4/2013: MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2: DEFENDANTS; DEFENDANTS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, VEOLIA TRANSPORTATION, INC. AND CAROLYN HAWKINS? MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE IMPRO

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (W/OUT PREJ, CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROBERT AND GENEVA DOBBINS ON 1/11/13 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (W/PREJ, COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Motion in Limine (#4 OF 4 FOR ORDER ALLOWING OFFSET TO ANY JUDGMENT BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF CO-DEFT, CITY OF LA ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Proof of Service (OF MINUTE ORDER OF 5/2/14 RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Order (ORDER RE DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Objection Document Filed (DEFENDANT GENEVA SMITH DOBBINS' AND ROBERT J. DOBBINS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF SHEILA WILLIAMS' OFFER TO COMPROMISE ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Objection Document Filed (DEFENDANT GENEVA SMITH DOBBINS' AND ROBERT J. DOBBINS' OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF NAYKEYA NEWELL'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE ) Filed by Attorney for Defend/XDefd/XComp

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (request for jury trial ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Summons Issued Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • Jury Instructions (PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.