This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2019 at 21:07:59 (UTC).

SHEGELL JENKINS VS THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC ET

Case Summary

On 01/06/2016 SHEGELL JENKINS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6209

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JENKINS SHEGELL

Defendants and Respondents

BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC. THE

RANDAL D. HAWORTH M.D. INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DURKIN & HOOD LLP

DURKIN MOLLY FLYNN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARENS ARTHUR H. ESQ.

HAVKIN STELLA A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC.

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

4/11/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: SEX (PREGNANCY) DISCRIMINATION (GOVT. CODE ? 12940(A)); ETC.

2/23/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: SEX (PREGNANCY) DISCRIMINATION (GOVT. CODE ? 12940(A)); ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES; ETC.

5/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES; ETC.

EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PRECLUDING THIRD PARTY MONICA BERLIN FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MOSES S. BARDAVID IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/22/2018: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER PRECLUDING THIRD PARTY MONICA BERLIN FROM TESTIFYING AT TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF MOSES S. BARDAVID IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11; ETC.

4/6/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11; ETC.

DECLARATION OF MOSES S. BARDAVID; ETC.

4/6/2018: DECLARATION OF MOSES S. BARDAVID; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE COUNSEL BARENS & BARDAVID FROM CROSS-EXAMINING WITNESS MONICA BERLIN; ETC.

4/6/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO PRECLUDE DEFENSE COUNSEL BARENS & BARDAVID FROM CROSS-EXAMINING WITNESS MONICA BERLIN; ETC.

DECLARATION OF MARQUI HOOD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER RE: THE APPLICATION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND/OR THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION & REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW

6/8/2017: DECLARATION OF MARQUI HOOD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER RE: THE APPLICATION OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE AND/OR THE CRIME-FRAUD EXCEPTION & REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SHEGELL JENKINS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $5060; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

6/23/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S SECOND DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SHEGELL JENKINS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $5060; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS

Minute Order

6/30/2017: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; ETC

7/5/2017: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF; ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPRESSION OF EVIDENCE AND MOTION FOR ISSUE SANCTIONS

7/28/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 PERTAINING TO DEFENDANTS' SUPPRESSION OF EVIDENCE AND MOTION FOR ISSUE SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DISMISSED CLAIMS AND PARTIES; DECLARATION OF MARQUI HOOD

7/28/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF DISMISSED CLAIMS AND PARTIES; DECLARATION OF MARQUI HOOD

PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

8/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S [PROPOSED] JOINT WITNESS LIST

EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, REOPENING DISCOVERY AND RE-SETTING DISCOVERY DEADLINES DUE TO UNAVAILABILITY OF NECESSARY PARTY; ETC.

8/8/2017: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, REOPENING DISCOVERY AND RE-SETTING DISCOVERY DEADLINES DUE TO UNAVAILABILITY OF NECESSARY PARTY; ETC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE SANCTIONS AND MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,410 FOR DEFENDANTS' AND THEIR COUNSEL'S WILLFUL SUPPRESSION OF EVIDENCE

11/14/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE SANCTIONS AND MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,410 FOR DEFENDANTS' AND THEIR COUNSEL'S WILLFUL SUPPRESSION OF EVIDENCE

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Filed by Shegell Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Shegell Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-03-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Shegell Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: SEX (PREGNANCY) DISCRIMINATION (GOVT. CODE 12940(A)); ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANTS THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, INC. AND RANDAL D. HA WORTH, M.D., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT: 1. SEX (PREGNANCY) DISCRIMINATION (GOVT. CODE 12940(A)); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Shegell Jenkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Marqui Hood (SBN #214718) Molly F. Durkin (SBN #246043) DURKIN & HOOD, LLP

8840 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 207 Beverly Hills, CA 90211

SHEGELL JENKINS

F“‘“’F

Su of Califeraia g@ nintyv nflm An%iple'i

FEB 2 3 2016

Sherri R, Z,SVE uthcer/Clerk By . Deputy

03¢3 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

SHEGELL JENKINS,

Plaintiff,

THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL

CENTER, INC. a California Corporation, RANDAL D. HAWORTH, M.D., INC,, a California Corporation and DOES 1

through 50, inclusive,

Defendants.

Case No.: Bc.w(,,zoq Dept : FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT:

1. SEX (PREGNANCY)

DISCRIMINATION

(Govt. Code § 12940(a))

2. RETALIATION FOR PROTECTED ACTIVITIES (Govt. Code § 12940(h))

3. FAILURE TO PREVENT

DISCRIMINATION 4 WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY

) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) 3 : JURY TRIAL DEMANDED )