This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2019 at 06:30:34 (UTC).

SHAUL DINA ET AL VS JOSEPH SAFRAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2015 SHAUL DINA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH SAFRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5466

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DINA DANIELLE

DINA SHAUL

Claimant

PEREZ DANIEL

Defendants and Cross Defendants

708 HAMPTON I LLC

MASHBIR LLC

ONE CAPITAL GROUP INC.

SAFRAN JOSEPH

O.K. LLC

HARROUSH MAYTAL

TROJANOWSKI ALBERT ILAN

HILASKI JIM

KARNI EREZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ONE CAPITAL GROUP INC.

SAFRAN JOSEPH

O.K. LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant Attorney

HOROWITZ ELSA

Defendant Attorney

KILLIAN WILFRED J.

Cross Defendant Attorney

WALKER HOLLY METZLER

Other Attorneys

NEIFERT MARY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/19/2017: Minute Order

ORDER RE: SHAUL AND DANIELLE DINA'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

12/19/2017: ORDER RE: SHAUL AND DANIELLE DINA'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

NOTICE OF HEARING DATES

12/28/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING DATES

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

12/28/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING DATES AND NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

1/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING DATES AND NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

3/21/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION ETC.

3/21/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION ETC.

PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ETC.

3/21/2018: PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ETC.

ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION ETC.

3/21/2018: ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE OF MOTION ETC.

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO STRIKE PARTIES ETC.

3/27/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO STRIKE PARTIES ETC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO STRIKE ETC.

3/27/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO STRIKE ETC.

Proof of Service

3/27/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF MARK N. STROM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

4/3/2018: DECLARATION OF MARK N. STROM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN AND ONE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. TO POST AN UNDERTAK

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN AND ONE CAPITAL GROUP, INC. TO POST AN UNDERTAK

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

4/3/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SHAUL DINA AND DANIELLE DINA TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ON 619 SOUTH JUNE STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA OR TO REQUIRE JOSEPH SAFRAN TO POST AN UNDERTAKING

415 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why sanctions of $250.00 should not be imposed for Joyce Trojanowski and Albert Trojanowski for failure to appear on 11/9/18 and 2/28/19) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the Court should not dismiss the matter for failure to prosecute cross complaint) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order to S...) of 03/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference; Order to S...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (w/prejudice as to the complaint/cross-complaint as to: does 1-100 and roes 1-30); Filed by Danielle Dina (Plaintiff); Shaul Dina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER AND OSC RE: SANCTIONS AS TO JOYCE AND ALBERT TROJANOWSKI AND OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS THE MATTER FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE); Filed by Danielle Dina (Plaintiff); Shaul Dina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (of withdrawal of Lis Pendens)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (of cancellation of motion to strike by Plaintiffs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
868 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Danielle Dina (Plaintiff); Shaul Dina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDED PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less