This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2019 at 10:04:25 (UTC).

SHATS INVESTMENT LLC VS NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2014 SHATS INVESTMENT LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6800

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHATS INVESTMENT LLC.

Defendants

CAL WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/18/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/16/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/8/2015: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/13/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/13/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER TSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

4/13/2015: DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER TSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/13/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/18/2015: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/18/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/9/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/22/2015: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/28/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/15/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

9/24/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

9/28/2015: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

9/28/2015: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER STSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

9/28/2015: DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER STSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketMEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketWrit issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketWrit-Other Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 38; Default Prove Up Hearing (Civil Default Prove Up Hearing; Finding in favor of Plaintiff) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION OF WAYNE M. ABB IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ALEXANDER STSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ALEXANDER TSAREVSKY IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shats Investment, LLC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less