This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2016 at 00:46:41 (UTC).

SHARON KU LING VS. MARIO ROBLES

Case Summary

On 04/12/2012 SHARON KU LING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIO ROBLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, ADR NEUTRAL, GAIL FEUER and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9266

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

ADR NEUTRAL

GAIL FEUER

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GAL. LING CHELSEA

GAL. LING TIFFANY

GAL. WONG CAITLYN

LEE WINNIE

LING SHARON KU

LING CHELSEA

WONG CAITLYN

LING TIFFANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ROBLES MARIO

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Not Classified By Court

ALBERT DONALD J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C & L LAW GROUP

CHENG JACK MIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON FAIR & COHEN

Cross Defendant Attorney

GILSLEIDER ENERLE & TREMBATH

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR CA?, R MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

9/13/2013: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR CA?, R MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/4/2013: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

9/4/2013: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

9/13/2013: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

9/13/2013: ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

ORDER TO DEPOSII MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

9/13/2013: ORDER TO DEPOSII MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

9/13/2013: ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

Minute Order

10/7/2013: Minute Order

MINUTE ORDER

5/17/2013: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PIC COURT

3/25/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT TO PIC COURT

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

9/4/2013: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Minute Order

10/3/2014: Minute Order

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTEO CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR C RU MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

9/13/2013: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTEO CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR C RU MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/17/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/25/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

9/4/2013: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (as to complaint only; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds (petitioner sharon ling claimant tiffany ling_ ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Approving Compromise (petitioner sharon ling claimant chelsea ling_ ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds (petitioner sharon ling claimant chelsea ling_ ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Approving Compromise Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Ord-Approving Compromise (petitioner sharon ling claimant tiffany ling_ ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise (petitioner sharon ling claimant chelsea ling ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise (petitioner winnie lee claimant caitlyn wong_ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise (petitioner sharon ling claimant tiffany ling ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2012
  • Answer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Cross-complaint filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Notice Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Application - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (WINNIE LEE) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • Application - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.