This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2019 at 22:50:05 (UTC).

SHARON C. KENNEDY VS METAL HORNS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2014 SHARON C KENNEDY filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against METAL HORNS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5938

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEDY SHARON C.

Defendants

KIND FOR CURES

METAL HORN INC.

HABEL NICK

CHASE JESSICA

CURES KIND FOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEENEY JAMES M.

PARKE JOHN H.

Defendant Attorneys

HAQUE NUZAYRA

HAVEN PETER T.

WELCH DAVID R.

DAVID R. WELCH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (AND BK STATUS RE DEFENDANTJESSICA CHASE;) - Status conference is held & cont.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Sharon C. Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL OF MAY 12, 2016 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO NICK HABEL ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (AS TO COMPLAINT AND DISMISSAL OF MAY 12, 2016 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO JESSICA CHASE AND METAL HORNS, INC. ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Sharon C. Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department M; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; OSC held & order is made) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2014
  • Opposition; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Opposition; Filed by Sharon C. Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Sharon C. Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Metal Horn, Inc. (Defendant); Kind For Cures (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Notice of Motion (Motion to Strike ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by Sharon C. Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less