This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 16:05:33 (UTC).

SHARON BARROTT VS. CHRISTIAN DANTE ROSSI, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2012 SHARON BARROTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTIAN DANTE ROSSI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN and CARY NISHIMOTO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7280

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

CARY NISHIMOTO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARROTT SHARON

Defendant

ROSSI CHRISTIAN DANTE

Not Classified By Court

RUSSELL ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAU PAUL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CAPRA-CUNNINGHAM MARISA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/14/2012: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/19/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

7/23/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

8/13/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/13/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-10-09 00:00:00

10/9/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-10-09 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER

11/9/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER

Case Management Statement

11/15/2012: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-11-21 00:00:00

11/21/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-11-21 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/27/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDIATOR

12/6/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-ASSIGNMENT-MEDIATOR

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-MEDIATION HEARING DATE

1/28/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE-MEDIATION HEARING DATE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

5/8/2013: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/11/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/1/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Minute Order -

8/13/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/25/2014: Minute Order -

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Jury Trial - Hearing Previously Adv. and Vac.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • Docketat 08:32 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Final Status Conference (ANDOSC RE FAILURE TO COMPLETE MED;8-13-13) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SHARON BARROTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by SHARON BARROTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (DOE 1 TRUE NAME: LORRAINE ANDERSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SHARON BARROTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by SHARON BARROTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHARON BARROTT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less