This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2020 at 01:45:35 (UTC).

SHARMALEE GOONEWARDENE VS. ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2012 SHARMALEE GOONEWARDENE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BARRY, LAW & MOTION, ROSS KLEIN, KELVIN D. FILER and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6406

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BARRY

LAW & MOTION

ROSS KLEIN

KELVIN D. FILER

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOONEWARDENE SHARMALEE

SHARMALEE GOONEWARDENE

Defendants

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC.

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC. NEW YORK

CHEMLA ALEANDRE DOE 2

DOES 1 TO 100

ADP LLC (DOE 1)

AD PROCESSING LLC DOE #1

ADP PAYROLL SERVICES INC DOE #2

CHEMLA ALEXANDRE DOE 2

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC.(CAC1774511)

ALEXANDRE CHEMLA ( DOE 2 )

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC.(NY DOS 1550102)

LLPZIMMERMAN JACKSON LEWIS

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC.CAC1774511

ADP LLC DOE 1

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLPZACK HILL

ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL INC.NY DOS 1550102

ALEXANDRE CHEMLA DOE 2

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROEMER GLEN - ATTORNEY

BROEMER GLEN ATTORNEY

BROEMER GLEN

SIMAN ALSHIAN

ALSHIAN SIMAN

GLEN BROEMER

Defendant Attorneys

JACKSON LEWIS LLP

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

JACKSON LEWIS LLP(MINDY NOVICK)

MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP(ZACK HILL)

JACKSON LEWIS LLP(ZIMMERMAN)

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/2/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

12/11/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

12/18/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

12/18/2014: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/22/2015: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT - GENERAL

1/22/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STATEMENT - GENERAL

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM - OTHER

1/22/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MEMORANDUM - OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFT'S NTC OF HRNG ON DEMURRER

1/22/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFT'S NTC OF HRNG ON DEMURRER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

1/22/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-01-23 00:00:00

1/23/2015: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2015-01-23 00:00:00

Amended Complaint

2/10/2015: Amended Complaint

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

2/10/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

2/17/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/18/2015: Motion for Summary Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

2/18/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/18/2015: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

2/18/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

2/18/2015: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B267010); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketUnknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketRemittitur filed (REMITTITUR ISSUED ON 3/14/18 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Docketat 08:36 AM in Department S27; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-12-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GOONEWARDENE SHARMALEE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (PLNTF - GOONEWARDENE - "JOINT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL" "THIS REQ FOR DISM W/ PREJ. DOES NOT DIMINISH ANY MANNER PLNTF'S EN TITLEMENT TO RETAIN PAYMENT BY ALT OUR ALREADY TO PLNTF $6143.76 ..._); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department S27; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1,378 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by SHARMALEE GOONEWARDENE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike (TO STRIKE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by SHARMALEE GOONEWARDENE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ALTOUR INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Altour International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ADP, LLC is a litigant