This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:37:03 (UTC).

SHAOXING COUNTY YUESHENG VS. TEX-ELLENT, INC., ET. AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2012 SHAOXING COUNTY YUESHENG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEX-ELLENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM BARRY, LAW & MOTION, ROSS KLEIN, LYNN D. OLSON and JOSEPH E. DILORETO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6374

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM BARRY

LAW & MOTION

ROSS KLEIN

LYNN D. OLSON

JOSEPH E. DILORETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SHAOXING COUNTY YUESHENG IMPORT & EXPORT

SHAOXING COUNTY YUESHENG IMPORT & EXPORTS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CORTES JERICK

MARSHAL FREIGHT INC. A CALIFORNIA

TEX

ZACKARY SHORAM

TESS VALDERAMA - DOE 2

SHAWN ZACKARY = DOE 1

SHORAM ZACKARY AN INDIVIDUAL

JERICK CORTES AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1-20

PARAMOUNT TESTILES

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

SHAHIN ZACKARY -DOE 1

SHAHIN ZAKARAEE - DOE 1

MARSHAL FREIGHT INC. A CALIF. CORP.

TEX-ELLENT INC. A CALIFORNIA

TEX-ELLENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

HON. CHRIS R. CONWAY (RET.)

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RESCH POLSTER ALPERT & BERGER

RESCH POLSTER & BERGER LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

COZEN O'CONNOR ( POSTER )

ROBERT & KEHAGIARAS (T ADKINSON)

ROBERTS & KEHAGIARAS LLP

COUNTRYMAN & MCDANIEL (B. LINDSAY)

ROBERTS & KEHAGIARAS LLP ( T ADKINSON)

KRANE & SMITH ( M SMITH )

ROME & ASSOCIATES APC

ROME & ASSOCIATES A.P.C.

NOVIAN & NOVIAN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (LB233246004 CHECK $20 plntf & defts - JOINT STIP FOR RETENTION OFJURISD UNDER CCP 664.6; AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION ; AND ORDER THEREON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • Notice of Continuance (PLNTF/ X DEFT - SHAOXING NOTICE OF CONT OF FSC AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL NEW DATE 4-28-14 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • Patial Dismissal(not entire case) (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS- COMPLAINT FILED BY TEX-ELLENT INC. & SHORAM ZACKARY FILED ON 5/2/2012 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • Jury Instructions (PLNTF- SHAOXING COUNTY ... PLNTF'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS 3-3-14 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Declaration (PLNTF - SHAOXING 2-27-14 DECL OF KHALLILI RE EXCLUSION OF WITNESSS DUE TO NON A PPEARANCE AND COURT ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • Notice of Motion (plntf - SHOAXING 9-18-14 NTC OF MO AND MO OF PLNTF FOR TERM. SANX AGAINWST DEFT TEX- ELLENT INC DBA PARMOUNT TEXTILES; P & A ; DECL ATTY - resch polster) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Objection Document Filed (DEFT- MARSHAL FREIGHT INC; CORTEZ; VALDERAMA 2-27-14 EVIDENTIARY OVJECTIONS TO PLNTF'S EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPP TO VADER AM'S MO FOR SJ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Reply (DEFT-MARSHALL FREIGHT INC; JERICK CORTES; TESS VALDERRAMA 2-27-14 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT VALDERRAM A'S MO FOR SJ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Reply (DEFT- MARSHAL FREIGHT INC; JERICK CORTES; TESS VALDERAMA 2-27-14 VALDERRAMA'S REPLHY TO PLNTFA ND X DEFT'S RESP TO SEPARATE STATMENT O F UNDISPUTED MTERIAL FACTS IN SUPP) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2012
  • Declaration (OF JERICK CORTES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINITFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A TEMPORARY RESTRAIN- ING ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Declaration (FOR EX PARTE WRIT OF POSSESSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI- TIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A TEMPORARY RESTRAING ORDER) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Declaration (OF SANDRA KHALILI REGARDING NOTICE TO OPPOSING PARTY OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Declaration (OF SHORAM ZACKARY IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, A TEMPORARY RESTRAIN- ING ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • Affidavit of Prejudice - Premptory Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.