This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 18:07:49 (UTC).

SHAORONG LIANG VS MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/28/2013 SHAORONG LIANG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4344

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIANG SHAORONG

Defendants and Respondents

GOODWIN RUBY

MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC

PACIFIC PALMS CONFERENCE RESORT

TAM WING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARLEO FRANK S. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF SHIN P. YANG

PIERRY LAW FIRM

FIRM PIERRY LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TUTT ANTOINETTE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, RESTITUTION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION; ETC

3/28/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, RESTITUTION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION; ETC

SUMMONS -

3/28/2013: SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RUBY GOODWIN; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; [PROPOSED] OR

5/10/2013: DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RUBY GOODWIN; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; [PROPOSED] OR

DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

5/10/2013: DEFENDANT?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/14/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

6/18/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

6/19/2013: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BASED ON THE NEW/REVISED EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT OF 2011 AND HIS STIPULATION TO ARBITRAT1ON BASED ON THE ORIGINAL EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT OF 2003 P

7/3/2013: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BASED ON THE NEW/REVISED EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT OF 2011 AND HIS STIPULATION TO ARBITRAT1ON BASED ON THE ORIGINAL EMPLOYMENT AGREEMENT OF 2003 P

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? PETITION TO COMI?EL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/8/2013: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? PETITION TO COMI?EL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT PACIFIC PALMS HAS WAIVED THE RIGHT TO FILE A REPLY TO HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE SECOND AGREEMENT.

7/12/2013: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT PACIFIC PALMS HAS WAIVED THE RIGHT TO FILE A REPLY TO HIS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION UNDER THE SECOND AGREEMENT.

DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF ANTOINETTE R. TUTT

7/15/2013: DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; DECLARATION OF ANTOINETTE R. TUTT

Minute Order -

7/17/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING

7/18/2013: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9/9/2013: NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order -

1/15/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION

1/17/2014: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING ARBITRATION

DEMAND FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

2/18/2014: DEMAND FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

Minute Order -

10/15/2014: Minute Order -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Status Conference (Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Status Conference (Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Majestic Industry Hills, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Palms Conference Resort (Legacy Party); Wing Tam (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF RUBY GOODWIN; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; [PROPOSED] ORDER [C.C.P. 1281, ET SEQ.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketDEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Majestic Industry Hills, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Palms Conference Resort (Legacy Party); Wing Tam (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Majestic Industry Hills, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Palms Conference Resort (Legacy Party); Wing Tam (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, RESTITUTION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR: 1. WRONGFUL TERMINATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Shaorong Liang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC PALMS CONFERENCE RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where MAJESTIC INDUSTRY HILLS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PACIFIC PALMS RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUTT ANTOINETTE RAMONA