This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:19:55 (UTC).

SHAKEE ILMAZIAN VS. THE NASA GROUP ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2011 SHAKEE ILMAZIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE NASA GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG and LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4275

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ILMAZIAN SHAKEE

Defendants

JOSICO PROPERTIES LLC

JOSIKO PROPERTIES

NASA GROUP THE

OHEBSION RAMISH

ROCHA NUEZ ABDOH CONSTRUCTION INC.

WEST HOLLYWOOD CITY OF

Others

ANTABLIN & BRUCE

WORMS CHIRSTINE M. ESQ.

Not Classified By Court

SCHIFFER DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEVEN ALEK LAW OFFICES OF

ANTABLIN & BRUCE

Defendant Attorneys

HAITH SCOTT C. LAW OFFICES OF

SELMAN & BREITMAN LLP

SKANE WILCOX

WILCOX SKANE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketNotice; Filed by SHAKEE ILMAZIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEK, Gerald Rosenberg, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Req for Dism (after Notice of Settlement) - Court Makes Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal ( ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (SEE 3/14/13 MINUTES) ); Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department Legacy; (Closed-ADR; Not held-Rmvd ADR-Settled prior) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department ADRO, ADR Neutral, Presiding; Closed-ADR (CHRISTINE WORMS, MEDIATOR) - Not held-Rmvd ADR-Settled prior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by WEST HOLLYWOOD, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketCross-complaint filed; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WEST HOLLYWOOD, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • DocketSummons; Filed by WEST HOLLYWOOD, CITY OF (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by SHAKEE ILMAZIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Com (ersonal service 11/10/2011 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Docketat 10:30 am in Department WEM, Linda K. Lefkowitz, Presiding; Notice (OF CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT) - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SHAKEE ILMAZIAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less