Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2016 at 14:37:27 (UTC).

SERVANDO GALINDO ET AL VS SANDVIK HARD MATERIALS CO. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/30/2008 SERVANDO GALINDO filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against SANDVIK HARD MATERIALS CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN and CAROLYN KUHL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7455

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN

CAROLYN KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECERRILROQUE JOSE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

H.B. CARBIDE

BOART LONGYEAR COMPANY [DOE 4]

KENNAMETAL INC.

FANSTEEL INC. [DOE 6]

AMMERAAL BELTECH INC. [DOE 5]

INNOVATIVE CARBIDE INC.

TUNGSTEN CARBIDE MANUFACTURING

DURAMET CORPORATION [DOE 1]

EXTRAMET PRODUCTS LLC

TECHMET CARBIDES INC.

VALENITE INC. [DOE 2]

CARBIDE TECHNOLOGIES INC.

HYDRO CARBIDE INC.

AMERICAN NATIONAL CARBIDE CO. [DOE 3]

METALWORKING INTERNATIONAL SALES CORP.

CARBIDE METALS INC.

CERATIZIT USA INC.

TDY INDUSTRIES INC.

SANDVIK HARD MATERIALS

Defendant and Cross Defendant

FANSTEEL INC. [DOE 6]

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADFORD & BARTHEL LLP

ROSE KLEIN & MARIAS LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LOCKE LORD BISSELL & LIDDELL LLP [IL]

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL LLP

ROBERTSON & VICK LLP

NIXON PEABODY LLP

TRESSLER SODERSTROM MALONEY & PRIESS LLP

TROPIO & MORLAN

FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

MCKAY GRAHAM & DE LORIMIER

CLINTON & CLINTON

LYNBERG & WATKINS PC

LOCKE LORD BISSELL & LIDDELL LLP [CA]

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

ARCHER NORRIS

GORDON & REES LLP

LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI LAW OFFICES OF

ROGANLEHRMAN LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

CLAUSEN MILLER PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2011
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • Notice (of Court order re: stip to retain jurisdiction over proposed settle- ment and ntc of entry of dism ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Stipulation and Order (RE TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice Complaint as to defendants Sandvik Hard Materials, Inc. and Valenite Inc. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial (w/ prej; complaint as to FANSTEEL INC, and HYDRO CARBIDE INC. only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • Notice (of intent to settle ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • Notice of Ruling (and cont of trial ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Notice of Change of Address (Firms New Address: 12800 Center Court Dr., Suite 500 Cerritos, CA 90703 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • Miscellaneous-Other (D's Proposed special voir dire by court ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
311 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. TECHMET CARBIDES, INC. BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT SIGNED BY GAYLE STHIKELEATH FOR WILLIAM P. POPE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. HYDRO CARBIDE, INC. BY ACKNOWLEDG. AND RECEIPT SIGNED BY SCOTT JABICH ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. H.B. CARBIDE COMPANY BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT SIGNED AND RECEIVED BY SPFEIFFER ON BEHALF OF BRAD LAWTON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. CARBIDE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT RECEIVED BY BERNICE L. SOURIS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. EXTRAMET PRODUCTS BY ACKNOWLEDGMEN T AND RECEIPT SIGNED BY LORIE WILTON ON BEHALF OF WAYNE DOUGLAS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. METALWORKING INTERNATIONAL INC. BY ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND RECEIPT SIGNED AND RECEIVED BY JOHN MAJHAN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TDY Industries, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kennametal Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN NATIONAL CARBIDE CO. is a litigant