This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 12:22:29 (UTC).

SERRANO MANAGEMENT GROUP ET AL VS SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEM

Case Summary

On 02/15/2012 SERRANO MANAGEMENT GROUP filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROLF M. TREU, MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS, MICHAEL JOHNSON, MALCOLM MACKEY, STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9025

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROLF M. TREU

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

MICHAEL JOHNSON

MALCOLM MACKEY

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GERRICK ARTHUR

SERRANO MANAGEMENT GROUP

Defendants and Respondents

MARSHAK GLENN M.D.

S&W HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.

SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA VITAL SOLUTIONS INC.

WEINER BERYL

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SPARKS JERRY R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ERIGERO STEPHEN J. ESQ.

PARKER DAVID B. ESQ.

PAULY ANDREW S. ESQ.

GEHRING THOMAS G. ESQ.

GREENWALD PAULY & MILLER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

3/1/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/2/2012: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/9/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: RELATED CASES

4/19/2012: NOTICE OF RULING RE: RELATED CASES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT CO., LLC TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/7/2012: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION OF DEFENDANT SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT CO., LLC TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE)

8/21/2012: NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS-APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) (APPELLATE)

NOTICE OF APPEAL

9/28/2012: NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order -

11/29/2012: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FURTHER CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BASED UPON PENDING APPEAL AND AUTOMATIC STAY IN BC479025 AND STIPULATED STAY IN RELATED CASE BC479031

8/20/2013: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FURTHER CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BASED UPON PENDING APPEAL AND AUTOMATIC STAY IN BC479025 AND STIPULATED STAY IN RELATED CASE BC479031

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

2/19/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

REMITTITUR

2/19/2014: REMITTITUR

Minute Order -

4/15/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

5/14/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF RULING

7/7/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

5/19/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT OF S&W HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. AND BERYL WEINER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/25/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSS. COMPLAINT OF S&W HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. AND BERYL WEINER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSSCOMPLAINT OF VITAL SOLUTIONS, INC. AND GLENN MARSHAK, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/25/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSSCOMPLAINT OF VITAL SOLUTIONS, INC. AND GLENN MARSHAK, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSSCOMPLAINT OF SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

2/25/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF CROSSCOMPLAINT OF SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 56; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2016-05-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by South Bay Hospital Management Co., LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Southern California Vital Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Glenn M.D. Marshak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
365 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Serrano Management Group (Plaintiff); Arthur Gerrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) RFFUSAL TO MAKE DISTRIBUTION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Serrano Management Group (Plaintiff); Arthur Gerrick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S&W HEALTH MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH BAY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEHRING THOMAS G. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAULY ANDREW STUART