This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2021 at 03:23:34 (UTC).

SEO KYU KIM ET AL VS VERMONT CARE CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/13/2013 SEO KYU KIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VERMONT CARE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1312

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM SEO KYU

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

DOES 1-20

GERI-CARE II INC. A CALIFORNIA

VERMONT CARE CENTER

Guardian Ad Litem

KIM JHIN YONG

Minor

KIM SEO KYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorney

MOON & YANG APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WROTEN KIPPY L.

WROTEN & ASSOCIATES INC.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

9/13/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

9/13/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

9/19/2013: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL -EX PARTE

10/31/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL -EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

10/31/2013: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

SUMMONS -

12/2/2013: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/31/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/2/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

DEFENDANT GERT CARE H, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

1/22/2014: DEFENDANT GERT CARE H, INC.?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

1/22/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEFENDANT GERI CARE II, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

1/22/2014: DEFENDANT GERI CARE II, INC.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

1/31/2014: STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER

Minute Order -

2/7/2014: Minute Order -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Case Previously Dismissed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JHIN YONG KIM (Legacy Party); SEO KYU KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by SEO KYU KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by JHIN YONG KIM (Legacy Party); SEO KYU KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by SEO KYU KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL -EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (RESUBMITTED FOR SEO KYU KIM GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SEO KYU KIM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR SEO KYU KIM GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. ELDER ABUSE AND NEGLECT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less