This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2016 at 19:31:12 (UTC).

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC VS. PSYCH MED, INC., ET-AL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2008 SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against PSYCH MED, INC , ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSH M. FREDRICKS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2162

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSH M. FREDRICKS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC

Defendants

HUDSON LYNDSEY FOSTER FAMILY AGENCY

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

HUDSON LYNDSEY PSYCH MED INC.

PSYCH MED INC.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADDEN & FULLER LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2008
  • Writ-Other (OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2008
  • Writ-Other (issued to: los angles county ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • Application - Miscellaneous (application for writ of possession ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • Request for Entry of Default (AND REQ FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT OF DFT PSYCH MED, INC., dba HUDSON LYNDSEY PSYCH MED, INC. AND HUDSON LYNDSEY FOSTER FAMILY AGENCY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • Partial Dismissal (W/O PREJ, AS TO DOE DFTS 1 THRU 50 INCLUSIVE, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Proof of Services by Mail Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: PSYCH MED, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2008
  • Proof of Service (PARTY SERVED: ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2008
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant