This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 12:39:22 (UTC).

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING, INC VS MCCARTHY BUILDING COMP.ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2013 SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MCCARTHY BUILDING COMP ETAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS, AMY D. HOGUE, ROGER ITO, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY, KENNETH R. FREEMAN and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3001

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

AMY D. HOGUE

ROGER ITO

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC. A CA CORP

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION INC. [BC549893]

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC.

COUNTYWIDE MECH. SYS. INC. [BC504522]

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC. A

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YERSEY

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A

MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANY INC. A

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY [BC504522]

L. A. UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

ZURICH AMERICAN INS. COMPANY [BC504522]

MCCARTHY BUILDING COMP. INC. [BC504522]

FIDELITY AND DEP. CO. OF MD. (BC549893)

ZURICH AMERICAN INS. COMPANY (BC549893)

MCCARTHY BUILDING COMP. INC. (BC549893)

FIDELITY AND DEP. CO. OF MD. [BC504522]

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BC549893)

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC.

SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC. A

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GILL & BALDWIN LAW OFFICES OF

GREGORY S. MARTIN & ASSOCIATES P.A.

KUHLMAN DAVID B.

POLSINELLI PC

POLSINELLI SHUGHART LLP

PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

GREGORY S. MARTIN & ASSOCIATES PA

CUTLER MICHAEL

PC POLSINELLI

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO

ATKINSON ANDELSON LOYA RUUD & ROMO APC

DUNN JONATHAN J.

ORBACH HUFF SUAREZ & HENDERSON LLP

KAMINE MARCIA HABER

SALAMONE MARY A.

SALAMONE MARY ANITA

Other Attorneys

CLAUDIO JOHN P.

HUFF DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING, INC. AND SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC. FOR EXPRESS CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

6/13/2014: ANSWER OF SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING, INC. AND SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC. FOR EXPRESS CONTRACTUAL INDEMNITY AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

Proof of Service -

6/13/2014: Proof of Service -

Minute Order -

1/21/2015: Minute Order -

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - -

1/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - -

Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL FILES INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED IN DISCO

3/1/2018: Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL FILES INADVERTENTLY PRODUCED IN DISCO

Minute Order - -

3/2/2018: Minute Order - -

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - -

3/2/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - -

Declaration - -DECLARATION OF PAUL V. RAYBURN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SEC

3/5/2018: Declaration - -DECLARATION OF PAUL V. RAYBURN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SEC

Notice of Motion - -NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2031.285

3/5/2018: Notice of Motion - -NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2031.285

Declaration - -AMENDED DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT BUILDING MCCARTHY COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL

3/6/2018: Declaration - -AMENDED DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT BUILDING MCCARTHY COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL

Declaration - -AMENDED DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL

3/6/2018: Declaration - -AMENDED DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL

Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S-APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL FI

3/6/2018: Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S-APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF PRIVATE PERSONNEL FI

Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS

3/6/2018: Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: MONETARY SANCTIONS

Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.551 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES

3/6/2018: Cross-Complaint - -CROSS-COMPLAINANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF DOCUMENTS CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.551 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES

Request for Judicial Notice - -REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S OPPOSITION TO MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF PERSONNEL FILES PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

3/9/2018: Request for Judicial Notice - -REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S OPPOSITION TO MCCARTHY'S MOTION TO COMPEL RETURN OF PERSONNEL FILES PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

Declaration - -DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

3/9/2018: Declaration - -DECLARATION OF DAN J. BULFER IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

Declaration - -DECLARATION OF HAL G. BLOCK IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

3/9/2018: Declaration - -DECLARATION OF HAL G. BLOCK IN OPPOSITION TO LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION REGARDING THE LEGITIMACY OF A CLAIM OF PRIVILEGE OR PROTECTION OF DOCUMENTS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -

3/9/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - -

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. (VC063001) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. (VC063001) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice the 1st and 3rd Causes of Action); Filed by HB Parkco Construction, Inc. [BC549893] (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (VC063001) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Cross-complaint filed Los Angeles School District (VC063001)); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (VC063001) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
458 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by COUNTRYWIDE MECHANICAL SYSTEMS, INC. (Plaintiff); Countywide Mechanical Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Scrape Certified Welding, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scrape Certified Welding, Inc. (Legacy Party); Countywide Mech. Sys., Inc. [BC504522] (Plaintiff); Countrywide Mechanical Systems Inc. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Scrape Certified Welding, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCRAPE CERTIFIED WELDING INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTICT is a litigant

Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES INC. A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant