This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 10:57:18 (UTC).

SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC VS YOLOA, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 SCOTT HALLEY ASSOCIATES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YOLOA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4557

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

OLD COUNTRY MILLWORK INC

YOLOA INC DBA PALISADES ROOFING & COSNTRU

MOES 1-50

CSI ARCHITECTURAL METAL INC.

COMMERCIAL SHEET METAL WORKS INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

YOLOA INC DBA PALISADES ROOFING & COSNTRU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

BRENNER KEITH G.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ANNA GOLAN ESQ.

CRAWFORD DAVID III

KIRK & MYERS

WOLFE & WYMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by OLD COUNTRY MILLWORK, INC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE COMPLAINT **REMAINING X-COMP FILED 6/21/16 STILL PENDING**); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (W/PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY: OLD COUNTY MILLWORK, INC. ON 2/19/16 ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial; Filed by SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by OLD COUNTRY MILLWORK, INC (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT OLD COUNTRY MILLWORK, INC. ON 5/9/16; . AS TO COMMERCIAL SHEET METAL WORKS, INC. ONLY;); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE: PROOF OF FILING OFDISMISSAL) - Held-Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES POSTED BY DEFT. ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (ANSWERING PARTY: YOLOA, INC. DBA PALISADES ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (YOLOA, INC. DBA PALISADES ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION VS. OLD COUNTRY MILLSWORK, INC., CSI ARCHITECTURAL METAL INC. AND MOES 1-50); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed (ON THE X-COMPLAINT OF YOLOA, INC. DBA PALISADES ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SCOTT HALLEY & ASSOCIATES, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD COUNTRY MILLWORK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMERCIAL SHEET METAL WORKS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where YOLOA INC. DBA PALISADES ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crawford, David III