Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 15:09:30 (UTC).

SCHLOSS, BERT JAMES - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 SCHLOSS, BERT JAMES - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BIDERMAN, JOSEPH S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8690

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BIDERMAN, JOSEPH S.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SCHLOSS JAMES D.

SCHLOSS BERT JAMES MD

SCHLOSS BERT J.

Claimants

BANK OF AMERICA

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES

MCCANN MERI K.

VERIZON WIRELESS

Not Classified By Court

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Decedent

SCHLOSS BERT JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

YAROSLOW GERALD M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2013
  • Receipt (Dist to Milton J. Schloss Jr. Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • Receipt (Dist to James D. Schloss Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Order (APPROVING WAIVER OF ACCTG AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND FORMER SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR AND PETN FOR DISCH OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE BIDERMAN Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Consent (TO WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR & FORMER SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ETC. Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • Notice - Hearing (For Hearing dated: 2013-05-16 Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice - Proposed Action (Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Accounting (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted After Trial-Uncontested 1st Hearing Date: 05/16/2013 Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 4 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Accounting (BY JAMES D. SCHLOSS Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Certification (Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2011
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Creditor's Claim (CR CL OF ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES $517.38 Filed By: ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES, Claimant )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Petition - Letters of Special Administration (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 10/28/2011 Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Bond (SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR $100,000.00 Filed by: Petitioner Posted By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Miscellaneous Document (WAIVER OF RIGHT TO SERVE AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ETC. Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Letters - Special Administrator (THESE LETTERS WILL EXPIRE ON 1-20-12 Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Probate Case Coversheet (Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENT TO DUTIES REC'D Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Order - Appointing Special Administrator (SIGNED BY JUDGE BIDERMAN Filed By: SCHLOSS, JAMES D., Petitioner Repres. By: YAROSLOW, GERALD M., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less