This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 at 08:21:22 (UTC).

SCHLOMIT MELAMED VS JOSHUA AARON EISENSTADT ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2012 SCHLOMIT MELAMED filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSHUA AARON EISENSTADT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ADR NEUTRAL, AMY D. HOGUE, ELIA WEINBACH, JAMES A. KADDO, ANTHONY J. MOHR, RICHARD J. BURDGE JR. and MARIA E. STRATTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7543

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ADR NEUTRAL

AMY D. HOGUE

ELIA WEINBACH

JAMES A. KADDO

ANTHONY J. MOHR

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

MARIA E. STRATTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MELAMED SCHLOMIT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

EISENSTADT JOSHUA AARON

Other

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS

Not Classified By Court

GROSSMAN MARK D. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. PIUZE

PIUZE MICHAEL JOSEPH

KANAREK MARTIN J.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MAYOFF WILLIAM BUDDY

CLASEN RAFFALOW AND RHOADS

LIEBHABER JACK MITCHELL

ROBINSON DAVID EARLE III

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

8/20/2012: Demand for Jury Trial

Minute Order

9/21/2012: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/26/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PSYCHOLOGICAL DME

1/10/2014: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PSYCHOLOGICAL DME

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIM1NE NO TWO TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING BEYOND THE SCOPE OF THEIR DESIGNATIONS AND ETC

2/5/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIM1NE NO TWO TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING BEYOND THE SCOPE OF THEIR DESIGNATIONS AND ETC

PLAINTIFF?S POSITION / PARTIAL OPPOSITION IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FOUR RE UNRELATED PROBLEMS

2/19/2014: PLAINTIFF?S POSITION / PARTIAL OPPOSITION IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FOUR RE UNRELATED PROBLEMS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FIVE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

2/19/2014: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FIVE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FIVE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REQUESTED BUT NOT PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF? JACK M. LIEBHABER

2/20/2014: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO FIVE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REQUESTED BUT NOT PRODUCED DURING DISCOVERY; DECLARATION OF? JACK M. LIEBHABER

DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO PLAINT I I?F? S OPPOSITI ON TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO SIX TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS LOSS OF EARNINGS; DECLARATION OF JACK M. LIEBHABER

2/26/2014: DEFENDANT?S REPLY TO PLAINT I I?F? S OPPOSITI ON TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO SIX TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS LOSS OF EARNINGS; DECLARATION OF JACK M. LIEBHABER

Minute Order

7/23/2014: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S [AMENDED] MOTION IN LIMINE NO FOUR

8/1/2014: PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S [AMENDED] MOTION IN LIMINE NO FOUR

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NOS THREE AND SEVEN - MEDICAL SPECIALS

8/1/2014: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE NOS THREE AND SEVEN - MEDICAL SPECIALS

Minute Order

10/14/2014: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. SEVEN ETC.

1/21/2015: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. SEVEN ETC.

Unknown

2/17/2015: Unknown

MELAMED'S REPLY RE HER MOTION TO TAX COSTS

5/11/2015: MELAMED'S REPLY RE HER MOTION TO TAX COSTS

REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL

5/21/2015: REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

6/26/2015: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

172 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Declaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
467 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2012
  • Demand-Jury Trial; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Answer-Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • Answer-Unverified Complaint; Filed by JOSHUA AARON EISENSTADT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Complaint; Filed by SCHLOMIT MELAMED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SCHLOMIT MELAMED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by Attorney-Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2012
  • Summons-Issued; Filed by SCHLOMIT MELAMED (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less