This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 06:56:07 (UTC).

SCA LLC VS KRON NETWORKS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2013 SCA LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KRON NETWORKS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2482

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SCA LLC

Defendants and Respondents

KRON NETWORKS INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STAUB D. JOSHUA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

9/25/2013: SUMMONS -

SCA LLC?S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

9/25/2013: SCA LLC?S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

9/30/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/22/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

1/23/2014: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/14/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

3/11/2014: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; (Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SCA LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SCA LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SCA LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketSCA LLCS VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCA LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KRON NETWORKS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAUB D. JOSHUA ESQ.