This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 05:36:57 (UTC).

SAVE WESTWOOD VILLAGE ET AL VS ANTOINETTE CHRISTOVALE ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2013 SAVE WESTWOOD VILLAGE filed an Other lawsuit against ANTOINETTE CHRISTOVALE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KEVIN C. BRAZILE, JAMES C. CHALFANT, BARBARA A. MEIERS, MARK V. MOONEY and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2388

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

JAMES C. CHALFANT

BARBARA A. MEIERS

MARK V. MOONEY

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BROWN SANDY

HAHN HARALD

SAVE WESTWOOD VILLAGE

VILLAGE SAVE WESTWOOD

Defendants and Respondents

CHRISTOVALE ANTOINETTE

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

LUSKIN DOREEN

LUSKIN MEYER

LUSKIN RENEE

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOUNDATION

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF NOEL WEISS

LEFKOWITZ DAVID I. ESQ.

WEISS NOEL LAW OFFICES OF

KESSEL BART L. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WHITLEY DANIEL M.

DRUMM KELLY L. ESQ.

KULKARNI AMRIT S. ESQ.

MEYERS NAVE RIBACK SILVER & WILSON

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/17/2013: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

RESPONDENT?S THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S NOTICI OF DEMURRER, DEMURRER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? IN

6/27/2013: RESPONDENT?S THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S NOTICI OF DEMURRER, DEMURRER AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? IN

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING OF RESPONDENT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

7/1/2013: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING OF RESPONDENT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S DEMURRER TO THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF TILE REGENTS OF THE LINIVERS1TY OF CALIFORNIA?S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARAT

9/4/2013: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF TILE REGENTS OF THE LINIVERS1TY OF CALIFORNIA?S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARAT

RESPONDENTS MEYER LUSKIN AND DOREEN LUSKIN, AKA RENEE LUSKIN AND UCLA FOUNDATION?S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE A

9/6/2013: RESPONDENTS MEYER LUSKIN AND DOREEN LUSKIN, AKA RENEE LUSKIN AND UCLA FOUNDATION?S AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS? INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WRIT OF MANDATE A

Minute Order

2/6/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS AND ETC.

1/30/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS AND ETC.

NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

3/27/2015: NOTICE TO PARTIES RE FEE FOR CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/12/2015: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

REPLY BRIEF OF FORMER RESPONDENTS MEYER LUSKIN, DOREEN LUSKIN, AKA RENEE LUSKIN AND THE UCLA FOUNDATION ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ON APPEAL OF ANTI-SLAPP ORDER

6/16/2015: REPLY BRIEF OF FORMER RESPONDENTS MEYER LUSKIN, DOREEN LUSKIN, AKA RENEE LUSKIN AND THE UCLA FOUNDATION ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS ON APPEAL OF ANTI-SLAPP ORDER

Proof of Service

7/9/2015: Proof of Service

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS/ PETITIONERS TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ETC.

9/8/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS/ PETITIONERS TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ETC.

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (CCP ? 526A, 1060)

9/16/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF (CCP ? 526A, 1060)

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SANDY BROWN?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF SCOTT MONATLIK AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; UNIVERSITY?S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

10/28/2015: THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SANDY BROWN?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF SCOTT MONATLIK AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; UNIVERSITY?S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Proof of Service

11/10/2015: Proof of Service

REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO STRIKE AGAINST FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/17/2015: REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO STRIKE AGAINST FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION ON MOTION FOR FEES ON APPEAL AND DIRECTING COURT CLERK TO PAY CASH DEPOSIT

12/4/2015: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION ON MOTION FOR FEES ON APPEAL AND DIRECTING COURT CLERK TO PAY CASH DEPOSIT

OPPOSITION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS

5/4/2016: OPPOSITION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS

255 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 68; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 68; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • NOTICE TO ATTORNEY RE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Abandonment of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.); Filed by Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Save Westwood Village (Plaintiff); Sandy Brown (Plaintiff); Harald Hahn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • IPROPED1 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS AND MOTION OF THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
561 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2013
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by University of California Foundation (Defendant); Meyer Luskin (Defendant); Doreen Luskin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR TAXPAYERS INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; WRIT OF MANDATE; DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Save Westwood Village (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

RECEIVED

Slgenc rfgL E D

ounty of L ACahfor ia

hefn' C or JANOS 2015 By j 3’7 Exec fOfffcer/C/ek

“ROOM 102

A ”lfa V'/hf{d IE-\ Deputy

SUPERiOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIF ORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

SAVE WESTWOOD VILLAGE, a nonprofit California corporation; SANDY BROWN an individual; HARALD HAHN, an 1nd1v1dua1

Plaintiffs, v' .

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF

CALIFORNIA, .a public corporation; and DOES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

Defendants.

Case No. BS142388

[BROPOSED] JUDGMENT ON FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

Hearing Date: ~ November 24, 2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m.

Judge: Hon. Mark V. Mooney Courtroom: Department 68

Action Filed: April 3, 2013

Tnal Date: October 17, 2016