This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 05:12:44 (UTC).

SAROU ASSADOURIAN, ET AL VS STARBUCKS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2012 SAROU ASSADOURIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. MILTON, HALM, HOWARD L. and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8990

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. MILTON

HALM, HOWARD L.

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASSADOURIAN SAROU AN INDIVIDUAL

MATEVOSYAN BORIS AN INDIVIDUAL

YASAKHANIAN GEORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DECMAC DEVELOPERS LLC A CALIFORNIA CORP

GOMEZ REBECCA AN INDIVIDUAL

LANFEAR FRANCIS AN INDIVIDUAL

STARBUCKS CORPORATION A WASHINGTON CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIRARDI & KEESE

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

GREGORY J. LUCETT

LAW OFFICES OF SHAYNE FIGGINS

MARIA KELLER ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REASSIGNNENT

3/27/2013: NOTICE OF REASSIGNNENT

Minute Order

8/15/2013: Minute Order

Unknown

8/19/2013: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

10/22/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

11/14/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

11/14/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY DEPARTMENT 91, 92 93)

12/3/2013: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY DEPARTMENT 91, 92 93)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

12/6/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/9/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/16/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/22/2014: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

8/4/2014: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

9/26/2014: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

10/7/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/17/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/2/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/6/2015: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (Complaint as to Defendant Rebecca Gomez only ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • DocketOSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (WITHOUT PREJUIDCE DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS-DEFENDANT DECMAC DEVELOPERS, LLC ONLY FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT OF STARBUCKS CORPORATION FILED ON OCTOBER 29, 2012) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketStipulation and Order (CONT TRIAL AND FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint (OF PLAINTIFFS SAROU ASSADOURIAN, GEORGE YASAKHANIAN AND BORIS MATEVOYSYAN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO FRANCIS LANFEARM AN IND. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketProof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) (COURT DELAY REDUCTION ACT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Decmac Developers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIGGINS SHAYNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLER MARIA M