Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 13:39:59 (UTC).

SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN VS PIGGY PROPERTIES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2016 SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PIGGY PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6783

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARONIAN SARKIS SERGE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

PIGGY PROPERTIES LLC

MARONIAN LORRAINE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JONES BELL ABBOTT FLEMING & FITZGERALD

MILLAR SANFORD IRWIN

ZUIDERWEG GORDON JAMES

Defendant Attorney

HOGAN STEVEN LANCE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC AND LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF. IMPROPERLY WITHELD DOCUMENTS BY THIRD-PARTY WITNESS SANFORD I. MILLAR, ESQ. IN CONNECTI

2/23/2018: DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC AND LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF. IMPROPERLY WITHELD DOCUMENTS BY THIRD-PARTY WITNESS SANFORD I. MILLAR, ESQ. IN CONNECTI

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED BY SANFORD I. MILLAR IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' FURTHER MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

9/10/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED BY SANFORD I. MILLAR IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' FURTHER MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

Order

12/14/2018: Order

Witness List

5/23/2019: Witness List

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

7/22/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

7/22/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

8/1/2016: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Unknown

8/17/2016: Unknown

Unknown

8/18/2016: Unknown

TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/1/2016: TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES LLC AKA PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC AND. LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

2/3/2017: DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES LLC AKA PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC AND. LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF POSTING ADVANCE JURY FEES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RESULTING TRUST 2. CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST; ETC

7/7/2017: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RESULTING TRUST 2. CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST; ETC

DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC'S AND LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/31/2017: DEFENDANTS PIGGY PROPERTIES, LLC'S AND LORRAINE E. MARONIAN'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION OF GORDON J. ZUIDERWEG SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SANFORD MILLAR, ESQ.

11/2/2017: DECLARATION OF GORDON J. ZUIDERWEG SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SANFORD MILLAR, ESQ.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SANFORD MILLAR, ESQ. [REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $5,680.00]; ETC

11/2/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF SARKIS SERGE MARONIAN TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SANFORD MILLAR, ESQ. [REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $5,680.00]; ETC

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

12/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Exhibit List; Filed by Piggy Properties LLC (Defendant); Piggy Properties, LLC (Defendant); Lorraine E. Maronian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Witness List (Defendants'); Filed by Piggy Properties LLC (Defendant); Piggy Properties, LLC (Defendant); Lorraine E. Maronian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Piggy Properties LLC (Defendant); Piggy Properties, LLC (Defendant); Lorraine E. Maronian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • at 03:00 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
194 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO CODE 0F CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 170.6; DECLARATION OF FREDRICK A. RAFEEDIE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RESULTING TRUST; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Sarkis Serge Maronian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC626783    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 47

Sarkis Serge Maronian v. Piggy Properties LLC, et al.

 

MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian

RESPONDING PARTY(S): No opposition on eCourt as of July 16, 2020

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiff alleged that Defendants held title to real property in trust for Plaintiff pursuant to an agreement between the parties in that the property was purchased with Plaintiff’s money. Defendants allegedly repudiated the agreement and purported to own the properties and their income and profits. On July 30, 2019, following a bench trial, the Court entered judgment in favor of Plaintiff.

Plaintiff moves to amend the judgment to include prejudgment costs.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian’s motion to amend judgment is GRANTED. The judgment is hereby amended to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11. Specifically, Page 3, Line 9, which now reads “Plaintiff is to recover all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law” is now replaced with “Plaintiff is to recover his reasonable costs in the amount of $7,394.11.”

Motion To Amend Judgment

Plaintiff moves to amend the judgment entered in his favor on July 30, 2019 to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11.

Request for Judicial Notice

Plaintiff requests that the Court take judicial notice of the California Secretary of State Statement of Information for Defendant Piggy Properties LLC, filed on August 19, 2019.

This request is GRANTED per Evidence Code § 452(c) (official acts of state executive departments), although this document does not appear to have any relevance to Plaintiff’s motion.

Analysis

Plaintiff brings this motion under CCP § 187, which “grants to every court the power to use all means to carry its jurisdiction into effect, even if those means are not set out in the code.” (NEC Electronics Inc. v. Hurt (1989) 208 Cal.App.3d 772, 778.) There is, however, a more pertinent statutory section and rule:

Costs are added to and become a part of the judgment:

(1) Upon the filing of an order allowing the costs pursuant to this chapter.

(2) If a memorandum of costs is filed pursuant to Section 685.070 and no motion to tax is made, upon the expiration of the time for making the motion.

(3) As specified in Section 685.095.

(CCP § 685.090(a), bold emphasis added; see also CRC 3.1700(b)(4) [“After the time has passed for a motion to strike or tax costs or for the determination of that motion, the clerk must immediately enter the costs on the judgment.” (bold emphasis added)])

Here, the Court entered judgment in favor of Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian on July 30, 2019, including “all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law.” (Declaration of Gordon J. Zuiderweg, Exh. A [Judgment, 7/30/19, at p. 3].) On August 14, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Memorandum of Costs claiming costs totaling $7,394.11 that was timely under CRC 3.1700(a)(1). (Zuiderweg Decl., Exh. B.) The time to file a motion to tax costs has now expired without Defendants challenging these costs. (CRC 3.1700(b)(1).)

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. The judgment is hereby amended to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11. Specifically, Page 3, Line 9, which now reads “Plaintiff is to recover all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law” is now replaced with “Plaintiff is to recover his reasonable costs in the amount of $7,394.11.”

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: July 20, 2020 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC626783    Hearing Date: July 17, 2020    Dept: 47

Sarkis Serge Maronian v. Piggy Properties LLC, et al.

 

GIVEN THE RECENT CORONAVIRUS CRISIS, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES REMOTE APPEARENCES BY “LACourtConnect.” PLEASE MAKE SUCH ARRANGEMENTS IF YOU WISH TO APPEAR REMOTELY AT WWW.LACOURT.ORG/LACC/. NO OTHER TYPES OF REMOTE APPEARANCES ARE AVAILABLE FOR THIS PARTICULAR COURTROOM, INCLUDING COURT CALL. IF YOU APPEAR IN PERSON AT THE HEARING, YOU WILL BE SUBJECT TO ALL SOCIAL DISTANCING RULES, INCLUDING THE WEARING OF AN APPROPRIATE FACE MASK/COVERING (ABSENT ANY EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES) AS CONTAINED IN THE APPLICABLE GENERAL ORDERS ISSUED BY THE PRESIDING JUDGE OF THE L.A.S.C.

 

MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian

RESPONDING PARTY(S): No opposition on eCourt as of July 16, 2020

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiff alleged that Defendants held title to real property in trust for Plaintiff pursuant to an agreement between the parties in that the property was purchased with Plaintiff’s money. Defendants allegedly repudiated the agreement and purported to own the properties and their income and profits. On July 30, 2019, following a bench trial, the Court entered judgment in favor of Plaintiff.

Plaintiff moves to amend the judgment to include prejudgment costs.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian’s motion to amend judgment is GRANTED. The judgment is hereby amended to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11. Specifically, Page 3, Line 9, which now reads “Plaintiff is to recover all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law” is now replaced with “Plaintiff is to recover his reasonable costs in the amount of $7,394.11.”

Motion To Amend Judgment

Plaintiff moves to amend the judgment entered in his favor on July 30, 2019 to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11.

Request for Judicial Notice

Plaintiff requests that the Court take judicial notice of the California Secretary of State Statement of Information for Defendant Piggy Properties LLC, filed on August 19, 2019.

This request is GRANTED per Evidence Code § 452(c) (official acts of state executive departments), although this document does not appear to have any relevance to Plaintiff’s motion.

Analysis

Plaintiff brings this motion under CCP § 187, which “grants to every court the power to use all means to carry its jurisdiction into effect, even if those means are not set out in the code.” (NEC Electronics Inc. v. Hurt (1989) 208 Cal.App.3d 772, 778.) There is, however, a more pertinent statutory section and rule:

Costs are added to and become a part of the judgment:

(1) Upon the filing of an order allowing the costs pursuant to this chapter.

(2) If a memorandum of costs is filed pursuant to Section 685.070 and no motion to tax is made, upon the expiration of the time for making the motion.

(3) As specified in Section 685.095.

(CCP § 685.090(a), bold emphasis added; see also CRC 3.1700(b)(4) [“After the time has passed for a motion to strike or tax costs or for the determination of that motion, the clerk must immediately enter the costs on the judgment.” (bold emphasis added)])

Here, the Court entered judgment in favor of Plaintiff Sarkis Serge Maronian on July 30, 2019, including “all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law.” (Declaration of Gordon J. Zuiderweg, Exh. A [Judgment, 7/30/19, at p. 3].) On August 14, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Memorandum of Costs claiming costs totaling $7,394.11 that was timely under CRC 3.1700(a)(1). (Zuiderweg Decl., Exh. B.) The time to file a motion to tax costs has now expired without Defendants challenging these costs. (CRC 3.1700(b)(1).)

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. The judgment is hereby amended to include prejudgment costs totaling $7,394.11. Specifically, Page 3, Line 9, which now reads “Plaintiff is to recover all reasonable costs incurred herein as allowed by law” is now replaced with “Plaintiff is to recover his reasonable costs in the amount of $7,394.11.”

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: July 20, 2020 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org by no later than 4:00 p.m. the day before the hearing.  All interested parties must be copied on the email.  It should be noted that if you submit on a tentative ruling the court will still conduct a hearing if any party appears. By submitting on the tentative you have, in essence, waived your right to be present at the hearing, and you should be aware that the court may not adopt the tentative, and may issue an order which modifies the tentative ruling in whole or in part.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOGAN STEVEN L.