This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 07:46:20 (UTC).

SARAH BUCHANAN VS FLORENTINO LUJANO JR

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 SARAH BUCHANAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FLORENTINO LUJANO JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0579

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BUCHANAN SARAH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

LUJANO FLORENTINO. JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RUDIN ERIC G. ESQ.

BAER & TREGER LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KURT BOYD

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/22/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/11/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/11/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Settlement

8/17/2018: Notice of Settlement

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/24/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/1/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

[PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

4/27/2018: [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Sarah Buchanan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Sarah Buchanan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Florentino., Jr Lujano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sarah Buchanan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Sarah Buchanan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less