This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2017 at 07:00:16 (UTC).

SARAH ALASERI VS STEVE HOWEY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 SARAH ALASERI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against STEVE HOWEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0442

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALASERI SARAH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

HOWEY STEVE

SHAHI SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GRESEN SOLOMON E. ESQ.

RGLAWYERS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DISCRIMINATION AND TERMINATION IN VIOLATIONOF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 12940(A); ETC

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DISCRIMINATION AND TERMINATION IN VIOLATIONOF GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 12940(A); ETC

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/22/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2017
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (***ENTIRE ACTION W/O PREJUDICE*** ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRESEN SOLOMON E.