This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:29:00 (UTC).

SARA POGOSYAN, ET. AL. VS NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2015 SARA POGOSYAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT, JOHN L. SEGAL and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8544

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

JOHN L. SEGAL

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POGOSYAN SARA

PMAC LENDING SERVICES INC.

Defendants

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ANDERSON MCPHARLIN & CONNERS LLP

RICHARD D. MARKS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

SONENTZ-PAPAZIAN VICKEN ESQ.

PC RICHARD D. MARKS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TREDER EDWARD A. ESQ.

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/5/2015: SUMMONS

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

1/5/2015: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

1/9/2015: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ETC

1/9/2015: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ETC

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

1/9/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order

1/9/2015: Minute Order

Unknown

1/12/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/14/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/14/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RECORDING OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

1/15/2015: NOTICE OF RECORDING OF PENDING ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

STIPULATION ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ETC

1/28/2015: STIPULATION ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ETC

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ELMIRA R. HOWARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

1/29/2015: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ELMIRA R. HOWARD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

DECLARATION OF NON MONETARY STATUS

2/6/2015: DECLARATION OF NON MONETARY STATUS

NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

2/6/2015: NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

Unknown

2/6/2015: Unknown

STIPULATION RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/13/2015: STIPULATION RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

ORDER RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

2/17/2015: ORDER RE ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by NationStar Mortgage, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 50; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 50; (Trial Previously Started; Verdict Reached) -

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Sara Pogosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketEx-Parte Application; Filed by Sara Pogosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketOrder for TRO; Filed by Sara Pogosyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketTEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sara Pogosyan (Plaintiff); PMAC Lending Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

RECEIVED OCT 27 2017

O o 9 N -PDEP-F\)SOH

EDWARD A. TREDER State Bar No. 116307 CHRIS C. CHAPMAN State Bar No. 234738

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER

TREDER & WEISS, LLP 20955 Pathfinder Road, Ste. 300

Diamond Bar, California 91765 (626) 915-5714 — Phone (626) 915-0289 — Fax File No. 4995049

Superior,.c-':g LHED ourt of : . County of Los? figggg;”'a

NOV 20 2017

Sherri R -grarter, Excougiv f: By-yé-c-\ e oenCieik ?@Depuw _ ally Fletcher

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

SARA POGOSYAN, an individual, - Plaintiff

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE

COMPANY; All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, or Interest in the Property Adverse to Cross-Complainant’s Title, or Any Cloud On Cross-Complainant’s Title To the Property; and ROES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Cross-Defendants.

CASE NO. BC568544

UNLIMITED CIVIL

ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO: HON. TERESA A. BEAUDET, DEPT. 50

JUDGMENT AFTER [PROPOSED]

. TRIAL ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

' | FILE BY FAX | PER CRC

2.30% Case Filed: January 5,2015 - | Trial Date: September 20, 2017 and October 20, 2017

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMWEST FUNDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant