This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2016 at 13:50:37 (UTC).

SANTIAGO GUERRERO, ET AL. VS. SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 SANTIAGO GUERRERO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7961

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANDREW C. KAUFFMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUERRERO GRISELDA

GUERRERO SANTIAGO

Defendants

DOES 1-10

COLDWELL BANKER SOURCE ONE REALTY

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPIERER WOODWARD CORBALIS & GOLDBERG

MARGULIES HAROLD P.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW D. WEISS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2010
  • Application - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. OF DEFT. EDUARDO RAZO ROSARIO ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2010
  • Writ-Other (OF EXECUTION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY: LOS ANGELES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2010
  • Declaration (OF ACCRUED INTEREST: $1,860.96 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Request for Correction (MEMO OF COSTS/ABSTRACT/WRIT REJECTED: DOCS NOT SIGNED ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • Request for Correction (REJECTION OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; WRIT OF EXECUTION: JUDGMENT AMOUNT IS INCORRECT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney (FORMER: SPIERER, WOODWARD. CORBELI NEW: HAROLD P. MARGUILIES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • Declaration (OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS INCURRED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2008
  • Amended Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO BY SERV. CO-TENANT FLORITA CRUZ; DECL. OF DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Request for Correction (REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED; DEFENDANT'S NAME IS DIFFERENT ON POS THEN THAT OF THE COMPLAINT AND DEFAULT ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • Request for Correction ( APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; REJECTED AND DENIED COMPANY IS IN PRO PER AND NEEDS TO BE REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL ) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. SOURCE ONE INVESTMENT, INC. DBA COLDWELL BANKER SOURCE ONE REALTY BY SERV. MOHAMMED BEIHAGHI ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLNT SERV. ON DEFT. EDUARDO RAXO DEL ROSARIO BY SUBSERV. ON FLORITA CRUZ; DECL. OF DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.