This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 13:36:15 (UTC).

SANG JUN SONG ET AL VS LE GRANDE ETAGE CONDOMINIUMS INC ET A

Case Summary

On 04/21/2014 SANG JUN SONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LE GRANDE ETAGE CONDOMINIUMS INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LUIS A. LAVIN, RUTH ANN KWAN, MARK V. MOONEY and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3409

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LUIS A. LAVIN

RUTH ANN KWAN

MARK V. MOONEY

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SHIM JOO HYUN

SONG SANG JUN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

GUPTA SURESH

HORIZON REALTY

LE GRANDE ETAGE CONDOMINIUMS INC.

LLOYD JEFF

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP

ZORMAGEN FARAHNAZ

ZORMAGEN FARAHNAZ [SETTLED]

LE GRANDE ETAGE CONDOMINIUMS INC.(SETTLED

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP (SETTLED)

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP SETTLED

LE GRANDE ETAGE CONDOMINIUMS INC.SETTLED

Intervenors

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY(SETTLED)

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANYSETTLED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY S. KIM

SHIODA GENE H. LAW OFFICES OF

KIM GREGORY SOOMIN

SHIODA GENE H.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAGER & DOWLING

GORDON & REES LLP

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

ACTION LEGAL TEAM

HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER LLP

SOFRIS MICHAEL N.

WEND CHRISTOPHER P. ESQ.

MARIAM CRAIG J.

WAHL JOSEPH M.

HAGER JOHN V.

GRIFFITH MICHAEL W.

Defendant and Intervenor Attorney

WEND CHRISTOPHER P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

3/8/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: continuance of Status Conference)

11/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: continuance of Status Conference)

Petition - Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award

1/11/2019: Petition - Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award

Order - ORDER COURTS TENTATIVE RE; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND PETITION TO CORRECT/VACATE ARBITRATION

3/8/2019: Order - ORDER COURTS TENTATIVE RE; PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND PETITION TO CORRECT/VACATE ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

6/11/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

7/31/2014: DEFENDANT MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF RULING

8/1/2014: NOTICE OF RULING

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. DAVIS- STERLINGCOMMON INTEREST DEVELOPMENT ACT (CIV CODE,. ?54000 ET SEQ.), ETC.

8/25/2014: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1. DAVIS- STERLINGCOMMON INTEREST DEVELOPMENT ACT (CIV CODE,. ?54000 ET SEQ.), ETC.

Minute Order -

10/6/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/15/2014: Minute Order -

DEFENDANT FARAHNAZ ZORMAGEN?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. AND JEFF LLOYD?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

10/17/2014: DEFENDANT FARAHNAZ ZORMAGEN?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC. AND JEFF LLOYD?S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SURESH GUPTA?S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY. OF PROCEEDINGS

10/20/2014: PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SURESH GUPTA?S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY. OF PROCEEDINGS

DECLARATION OF ARDEN RODRIGUEZ

10/27/2014: DECLARATION OF ARDEN RODRIGUEZ

FARAHNAZ ZORMAGEN'S REPLY TO DEMURRER

12/10/2014: FARAHNAZ ZORMAGEN'S REPLY TO DEMURRER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS SANG JUN SONG AND J00 HYUN SHIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

2/13/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS SANG JUN SONG AND J00 HYUN SHIM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

5/29/2015: PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

5/24/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

7/19/2017: Minute Order -

248 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
543 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sang Jun Song (Plaintiff); Joo Hyun Shim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. DAVIS- STERLING COMMON INTEREST DEVELOPMENT ACT (CIV CODE, S 1350 ET SEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEND CHRISTOPHER P