This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/19/2016 at 08:37:42 (UTC).

SANDSTONE PROPERTIES, LP VS SUNG HAK CHOI

Case Summary

On 12/24/2013 SANDSTONE PROPERTIES, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SUNG HAK CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6578

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP

Defendants

CHOI JEONG IM

CHOI SUNG HAK

ACE CLEANERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.

LONG ESQ. HELEN GRAYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2014
  • Cost Bill after Judgmt(685.070ccp) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Writ-Other (ISSUED TO SAN DIEGO CO ) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Writ-Other (ISSUED TO LA CO ) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Cost Bill after Judgmt(685.070ccp) Filed by Judgment Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Judgment (AFTER COURT TRIAL, BY COURT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • Declaration (Of Reassignment ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • Counter Request for Trial Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANDSTONE PROPERTIES LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG HELEN GRAYCE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.