This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2016 20:48:53

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 a Family - Legal Separation case was filed by Sandra Luz Riedel Cover against Charles Lee Cover in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX6512
  • Filing Date 06/25/2012
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Family - Legal Separation
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Riedel-cover Sandra Luz
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Respondent Cover Charles Lee
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Petitioner Riedel-cover Sandra
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2014
  • Judgment
  • 08/08/2014
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment
  • 07/09/2014
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc
  • 07/09/2014
  • Stipulation, Appearance & Waivers
  • 07/09/2014
  • Declaration-Default
  • 07/09/2014
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt
  • 05/19/2014
  • Judgment-Package Received-STIP
  • 05/19/2014
  • Response
  • 05/15/2014
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Respondent
  • 10/24/2013
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment
  • 04/25/2013
  • Notice-Case Review Re Default
  • 06/29/2012
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com
  • 06/25/2012
  • Declaration-Uniform Custody Minor' Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/25/2012
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner
  • 06/25/2012
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.