This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 10:02:25 (UTC).

SANDRA HORTON ET AL VS NORTH LAKE VILLAS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2014 SANDRA HORTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORTH LAKE VILLAS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART and ELIA WEINBACH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1408

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

ELIA WEINBACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HORTON SANDRA

POWELL LORETTA

SANDRA HORTON

LORETTA POWELL

Defendants and Respondents

BOUTROS JASON K. M.D.

DO KHAI M.D.

DOES 1-25

HAMILTON EMMA

HAMILTON JEFFIE JR.

JASON BOUTROS MD INC & ASSOCIATES

NORTH LAKE VILLAS INC.

YOUN ELISABETH S. D.P.M.

EMMA HAMILTON

JASON K. BOUTROS M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL

KHAI DO. M.D. AN INDIVIDUAL

JEFFIE HAMILTON JR.

ELISABETH S. YOUN D.P.M. AN INDIVIDUAL

KHAI DO. M.D. AN

JASON K. BOUTROS M.D.

JR. JEFFIE HAMILTON

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JOHNSON MOORE ESQ.

JOHNSON MOORE

MOORE JOHNSON

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SUSSON PARRETT & ODELL

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

PARRETT JAMES R. ESQ.

EGAN EUGENE J. ESQ.

REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF SANDRA HORTON

4/3/2014: DECLARATION OF SANDRA HORTON

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/13/2014: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/19/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/19/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE RULES OF COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

5/19/2014: DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE RULES OF COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/19/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/19/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

5/27/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE (REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. VOUN, D.P.M.)

12/4/2014: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ITEMS IN DISPUTE (REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE TO DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. VOUN, D.P.M.)

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, FORM INTERROGATORY 12.1, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE

12/4/2014: NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE, FORM INTERROGATORY 12.1, AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE FROM DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M. AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,0

12/4/2014: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE FROM DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M. AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,0

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

2/11/2015: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS TO OPINIONS AND FACTS RENDERED AT DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/7/2016: DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO LIMIT PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS TO OPINIONS AND FACTS RENDERED AT DEPOSITION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE CAUSATION AND CACI 430; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/7/2016: DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE CAUSATION AND CACI 430; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

9/7/2016: DEFENDANT ELISABETH S. YOUN, D.P.M.'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 92; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Verdict Reached) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketStipulation; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketJury Instructions; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
286 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sandra Horton (Plaintiff); Loretta Powell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons ((4) North Lake Villas, Inc. Youn, Elisabeth S., D.P.M. Jason Boutros, MD, Inc & Assc Boutros, Jason K., M.D.); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION OF LORETTA FIELDS-POWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SANDRA HORTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sandra Horton (Plaintiff); Loretta Powell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. ELDER ABUSE (WELFARE & INSTITUTIONS CODE 15600, ET SEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JASON BOUTROS M.D. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARRETT JAMES R. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REINHOLTZ JACK R. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EGAN EUGENE J. ESQ.