This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 01:24:20 (UTC).

SANDRA HOPE VS. RUSSELL GONZALEZ AND KAYLA GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 SANDRA HOPE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RUSSELL GONZALEZ AND KAYLA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8557

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SANDRA HOPE AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE

SANDRA HOPE AS EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF CHRISTINE SHANKLIN WILLIAMS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KAYLA GONZALEZ

DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

RUSSELL GONZALEZ

GONZALEZ KAYLA

GONZALEZ RUSSELL

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIMA LAW GROUP INC.

Other Attorneys

VICTOR LEON ARDEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order

4/13/2017: Minute Order

Cross-Complaint

5/10/2017: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

6/6/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

6/28/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

8/29/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/31/2017: Minute Order

Motion for Summary Judgment

1/26/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

12/4/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/12/2018: Declaration

Reply

3/27/2019: Reply

Objection

4/3/2019: Objection

Other -

4/4/2019: Other -

Case Management Statement

4/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration

5/21/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/24/2019: Unknown

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF LEON FOR OSC RE-DISMISSAL); Filed by RUSSELL GONZALEZ (Legacy Party); KAYLA GONZALEZ (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Memorandum (in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended); Filed by Sandra Hope, as executrix of the Estate of Christine Shanklin Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Motion re: (to File Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Sandra Hope, as executrix of the Estate of Christine Shanklin Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by KAYLA GONZALEZ (Cross-Complainant); RUSSELL GONZALEZ (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Court Order (Court Order; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-04-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-02-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Sandra Hope, as executrix of the Estate of Christine Shanklin Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Sandra Hope, as executrix of the Estate of Christine Shanklin Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sandra Hope, as executrix of the Estate of Christine Shanklin Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less