This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2015 at 23:17:02 (UTC).

SANDEE ESTRADA VS HD SUPPLY REPAIR & REMODEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 SANDEE ESTRADA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HD SUPPLY REPAIR REMODEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ABRAHAM KHAN, TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON, IRVING FEFFER and ADR NEUTRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6865

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ABRAHAM KHAN

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

IRVING FEFFER

ADR NEUTRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA SANDEE

Defendants

ARREDONDO GEORGE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

HD SUPPLY REPAIR & REMODEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HADSELL STORMER KEENY RICHARDSON

MUNOZ SANDRA C. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JESSE M. CARYL

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

1/22/2010: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT DR. COHEN

10/13/2009: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT DR. COHEN

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISCRIMINATION AND FAILURE TO PREVENT DISCRIMINATION BASED ON DISABILITY, ETC.

8/22/2008: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISCRIMINATION AND FAILURE TO PREVENT DISCRIMINATION BASED ON DISABILITY, ETC.

PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF

10/1/2009: PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/23/2008: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1] ADMITTING DINITA JAMES PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

1/4/2010: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1] ADMITTING DINITA JAMES PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

CIVIL DEPOSIT

9/29/2009: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

4/13/2009: Minute Order

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE OPINION TESTIMONY OF INSHISHIAN

10/6/2009: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE OPINION TESTIMONY OF INSHISHIAN

(MIL #1) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY PRIOR WORKERS COMPENSATION CLAIMS MADE BY PLAINTIFF

10/1/2009: (MIL #1) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE REGARDING ANY PRIOR WORKERS COMPENSATION CLAIMS MADE BY PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE; ETC.

1/4/2010: PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE; ETC.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER

3/13/2009: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1] ADMITTING DINITA JAMES PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

1/5/2010: ORDER ON DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER: 1] ADMITTING DINITA JAMES PRO HAC VICE; ETC.

SUMMONS

8/22/2008: SUMMONS

Minute Order

1/5/2010: Minute Order

PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST

10/1/2009: PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE "IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED" EXPERT

10/9/2009: DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE "IMPROPERLY DESIGNATED" EXPERT

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE REMARK BY RICH FIECHTER

10/6/2009: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE REMARK BY RICH FIECHTER

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2010
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • Order Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Opposition Document Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Ex-Parte Application Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO OTHER - ALL CLAIMS (2ND AND 9TH CAUSES OF ACTION) AGAINST DEFENDANT GEORGE ARREDONDO ONLY AS STATED IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • Notice of Ruling (RE: DEFT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; SET FOR 10-23-09 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • Order (*re ex parte application to continue the trial date -signed by Judge Khan- ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • Ex-Parte Application (to continue the ex parte application to continue the trial; memo of points & authorities; declaration of Jesse M. Caryl in support; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • Notice of Ruling (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE DEFENSE EXPERT DR. COHEN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2009
  • Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.