Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:22:28 (UTC).

SAMUEL KANTSEBOVSKY VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 SAMUEL KANTSEBOVSKY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7070

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KANTSEBOVSKY SAMUEL

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MACK JULIA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT GOVERNMENT TORT LIABILITY DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY

10/12/2016: COMPLAINT GOVERNMENT TORT LIABILITY DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY

SUMMONS

10/12/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/8/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KENNETH F. CARRASCO

11/29/2016: NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KENNETH F. CARRASCO

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBIT (FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEMURRER)

11/29/2016: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBIT (FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEMURRER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 92; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 92; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 92; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Samuel Kantsebovsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRER; DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KENNETH F. CARRASCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; EXHIBIT (FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEMURRER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Samuel Kantsebovsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Samuel Kantsebovsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT GOVERNMENT TORT LIABILITY DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less