This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 14:15:59 (UTC).

SALVADOR NAVARRO VS. MERCURY AIR GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2012 SALVADOR NAVARRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MERCURY AIR GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7839

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO SALVADOR

Claimant

DHL AND NEW HAMPSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MERCURY AIR GROUP INC.

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KANTOR & KANTOR LLP

Claimant Attorney

ALBERT AND MACKENZIE

Defendant Attorney

KENNEY & MARKOWITZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGM4?IENT

4/9/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGM4?IENT

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

5/22/2013: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE RE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/18/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

12/30/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT

1/7/2014: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/19/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2014
  • Request for Dismissal (with prejudice, entire action ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Notice (of Order to show cause re Dism. ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • Notice (PROOF OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney For Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • Notice (OF TRIAL & F.S.C. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • Miscellaneous-Other (request for notice ) Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • Receipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT - JURY FEES POSTED BY PLTF. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • Declaration (OF MARK LIEBER RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO PROSECUTE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed (ANS. BY DEFT., MERCURY AIR GROUP, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: MERCURY AIR GROUP, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less