This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:00:41 (UTC).

SALLY ANNA SARGENT VS. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

Case Summary

On 11/03/2015 SALLY ANNA SARGENT filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4620

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARGENT SALLY ANNA

Defendants

HINDENBURG SONJA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

MONTES JACQUELINE V.

PAYASLYAN ALICIA

POGOSNYAN SRBUI

TASHTCHIAN LISA

Other

BARTON GLUGMAN & OETTING LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD B. DAVIS ATTORNEY AT LAW

BARTON GLUGMAN & OETTING LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

6/4/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

6/24/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • at 11:04 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Notice; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-05-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant); Jacqueline V. Montes (Defendant); Lisa Tashtchian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant); Jacqueline V. Montes (Defendant); Lisa Tashtchian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-01-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Notice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant); Jacqueline V. Montes (Defendant); Lisa Tashtchian (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Sally Anna Sargent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Sally Anna Sargent (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.