This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:34:06 (UTC).

SALDIVAR, ELENA VS SALDIVAR, HIPOLITO

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 SALDIVAR, ELENA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALDIVAR, HIPOLITO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3392

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SALDIVAR ELENA

Respondent

SALDIVAR HIPOLITO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 01-26-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-29-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Saldivar, Elena ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less