Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:05:38 (UTC).

SAIMON SHABANDARI VS TENTEN WILSHIRE LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 SAIMON SHABANDARI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TENTEN WILSHIRE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8080

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MAREY AHMED H.

SHABANDARI SAIMON

MACHADO HAROLD M.

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

TENTEN WILSHIRE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DAVID YEREMIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

YEREMIAN DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS LLP

 

Court Documents

Other -

5/8/2017: Other -

FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

11/6/2015: FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Response

8/11/2016: Response

Minute Order

11/2/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/16/2016: Minute Order

Status Report

1/27/2017: Status Report

Stipulation and Order

1/31/2017: Stipulation and Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/17/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Motion

4/17/2017: Notice of Motion

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/17/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice

6/20/2017: Notice

Declaration

9/6/2017: Declaration

Request for Judicial Notice

9/6/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

9/6/2017: Motion for Final Approval of Settlement

Supplemental Declaration

9/20/2017: Supplemental Declaration

Default Judgment

10/10/2017: Default Judgment

Minute Order

10/10/2017: Minute Order

Notice

10/16/2017: Notice

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 10; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Declaration (of Carole Thompson on Behalf of Settlement Administrator CPT Group, Inc. Regarding payments); Filed by HAROLD M. MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF CAROLE THOMPSON ON BEHALF OF SETTLEMENT ADMINISTRATOR CPT GROUP, INC. REGARDING PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice; Filed by HAROLD M. MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Notice -NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 322; Fairness Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Order; Filed by HAROLD M. MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • -POSTING TO MESSAGE BOARD: Message Title: 2 issues re final approval motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Default Judgment -FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by TenTen Wilshire, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Answer; Filed by TenTen Wilshire, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 322; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Saimon Shabandari (Plaintiff); HAROLD M. MACHADO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MISCLASSIFICATION OF EMPLOYEES UNDER LABOR CODE 515; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TENTEN WILSHIRE LLC is a litigant