This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2016 at 18:10:33 (UTC).

SAENZ, JUAN PABLO - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 06/05/2013 SAENZ, JUAN PABLO - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COWAN, DAVID J.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2037

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COWAN, DAVID J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CABRERA JOSE RICARDO

CABRERA DIANA CATALINA

Decedent

SAENZ JUAN PABLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AKBARI A. ILYAS ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2015
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Order - Terminating Proceedings (Filed By: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Petition - Terminate Proceedings (Judgment by Court-Petition Granted Supervisory Order 1st Hearing Date: 06/04/2015 Filed By: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • Letters - Special Administrator (Full Authority Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner Issued To:: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Petition - Letters of Special Administration (ex parte Filed By: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner Complaint Num: 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Waiver - (No Fee) (Filed by: Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Declaration (Filed By: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Court Supervision (Conversion Purpose)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Order - Appointing Special Administrator (Filed By: Cabrera, Diana Catalina, Petitioner Repres By: Akbari, A. Ilyas, Esq., Attorney for Petitioner )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKBARI A. ILYAS ESQ.