This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 03:53:28 (UTC).

S K MACHINERY MOVING INC VS C&H SPORTSWEAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2015 S K MACHINERY MOVING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against C H SPORTSWEAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7425

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

S.K. MACHINERY MOVING INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

C&H SPORTSWEAR

CONTRERAS ADAN CUEVA

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Defendant and Respondent

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Cross Defendants

CARGO NETWORK SERVICE INC

SOON GIL PARK

SI JONG LEE

SI LEE

ROES 1-100

SILLA AMERICA

SUNG K. LEE

MICHELLE Y. LEE

LEE SI

LEE MICHELLE Y.

LEE SUNG K.

LEE SI JONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RYU LAW FIRM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BIGGINS CHAD ESQ.

THE FUENTES LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/2/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION (CERTIFICATE OF GOURNDS FOR ASSIGNMENT TO COURTHOUSE LOCATION); NOTI

4/22/2015: NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION (CERTIFICATE OF GOURNDS FOR ASSIGNMENT TO COURTHOUSE LOCATION); NOTI

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS ADAN CUEVA AND C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

5/6/2015: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS ADAN CUEVA AND C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/6/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS ADAN CUEVA AND C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

5/7/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS ADAN CUEVA AND C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

7/22/2015: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER

RULING

8/4/2015: RULING

Minute Order

8/4/2015: Minute Order

REPORT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/5/2015: REPORT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/5/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/24/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT

Minute Order

10/6/2015: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/28/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/3/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/3/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

11/30/2015: Minute Order

JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF, ADAN CUEVA/C&H SPORT WEAR'S CROSS COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS ETC.

12/7/2015: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF, ADAN CUEVA/C&H SPORT WEAR'S CROSS COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS ETC.

Minute Order

12/18/2015: Minute Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • Unknown Document Type; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 20; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 20; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 31; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • at 08:33 AM in Department 20; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 31; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT TO EXTEND CROSS- DEFENDANT'S ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2015
  • Notice; Filed by C&H Sportswear (Legacy Party); Adan Cueva Contreras (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS ADAN CUEVA AND C&H SPORTSWEAR, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION (CERTIFICATE OF GOURNDS FOR ASSIGNMENT TO COURTHOUSE LOCATION); NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT-UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE; VOLUNTARY E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION (CERTIFICATE OF GOURNDS FOR ASSIGNMENT TO COURTHOUSE LOCATION); NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT-UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE; VOLUNTARY E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by S.K. Machinery Moving, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C&H SPORTSWEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Silla America, Inc. is a litigant